State Farm Life Insurance Company v. Steve L Mesner, Jr et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John W Holcomb |
Referred: | Karen E Scott |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00465 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 3:11 AM PDT |
Defendant
Sheri L Diaz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Frank F Mesner
|
|
Defendant
Steve L Mesner, Jr
|
|
Defendant
Kathleen V Wedmore
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
State Farm Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 06/07 1:41 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge John W. Holcomb. t is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED as follows: State Farm shall pay the Policy's death benefit and any interest hereon in its entirety in four equal portions to all four named and primary beneficiaries Steve L. Mesner, Jr., Sheri L. Diaz, Kathleen V. Wedmore, and Frank F. Mesner. Upon payment of the Policy's death benefit and interest thereon to the four beneficiaries, State Farm is DISCHARGED from further liability related to the policy. State Farm is AWARDED attorneys' fees and costs related to this nterpleader action in the amount of $3,124.00, to be deducted from the Policy's death benefit and interest thereon paid to the four beneficiaries. All Parties shall bear its/her/his own attorneys' fees and costs. This action is DISMISSED its entirety with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (yl) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Judgment
Mon 06/05 1:23 PM
STIPULATION for Judgment as to filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader State Farm Life Insurance Company.(Tong, Geoffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 04/25 9:21 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 04/24 9:17 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 for Interpleader filed by Defendant Sheri L Diaz.(Attorney Charles George Bakaly, IV added to party Sheri L Diaz(pty:dft))(Bakaly, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
service
Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed
Tue 04/04 3:10 PM
NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff State Farm Life Insurance Company, upon Defendant Sheri L Diaz acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 4/3/2023, answer due 4/24/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Sheri L. Diaz, Defendant. (Tong, Geoffrey) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed
Fri 03/31 11:48 AM
NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff State Farm Life Insurance Company, upon Defendant Frank F Mesner acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/25/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Frank F. Mesner, Defendant. (Tong, Geoffrey) |
|
11 | 11
service
Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed
Fri 03/31 11:46 AM
NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff State Farm Life Insurance Company, upon Defendant Steve L Mesner, Jr acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/25/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Steve L. Mesner, Jr., Defendant. (Tong, Geoffrey) |
|
10 | 10
service
Notice and Acknowledgment of Service (CV-21) Executed
Fri 03/31 11:44 AM
NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff State Farm Life Insurance Company, upon Defendant Kathleen V Wedmore acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 3/25/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Kathleen V. Wedmore, Defendant. (Tong, Geoffrey) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 03/16 10:06 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 2:06 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Sheri L Diaz, Frank F Mesner, Steve L Mesner, Jr, Kathleen V Wedmore. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:02 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:02 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:01 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (car) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 4:52 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader State Farm Life Insurance Company. (Tong, Geoffrey) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 4:48 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader State Farm Life Insurance Company, identifying State Farm Life Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Tong, Geoffrey) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 4:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Interpleader State Farm Life Insurance Company. (Tong, Geoffrey) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 4:10 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34955688 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff-in-Interpleader State Farm Life Insurance Company. (Attorney Geoffrey T Tong added to party State Farm Life Insurance Company(pty:intpl))(Tong, Geoffrey) |