California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Case #: 2:23-cv-01812
Nature of Suit422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158
Cause28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BAP)
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023
Terminated:Jul 20, 2023

Debtor
Allana Baroni

,
Represented By
Richard L Antognini
Law Office Of Richard Antognini
contact info
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 2:08 AM PDT
Appellant
Richard L. Antognini
Represented By
Richard L Antognini
Law Office Of Richard Antognini
contact info
Appellant
Allana Baroni
Represented By
Richard L Antognini
Law Office Of Richard Antognini
contact info
Appellant
James Baroni
Represented By
Richard L Antognini
Law Office Of Richard Antognini
contact info
Appellee
David Seror
Represented By
Steven T Gubner
Bg Law LLP
contact info
Jessica Lynn Bagdanov
Bg Law LLP
contact info
Susan K Seflin
Bg Law LLP
contact info
Jason B Komorsky
Bg Law LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, July 20, 2023
18 18 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 07/20 5:01 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This appeal is DISMISSED for failure to prosecute. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
17 17 respm Statement (Motion related) Wed 07/19 5:22 PM
STATEMENT of Status of compliance with 6 28-2023 OSC NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: failure to prosecute 13 filed by In re Debtor Allana Baroni. (Antognini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
16 16 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 07/17 2:22 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Motion13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 15, 2023
15 15 respm Motion Related Document Sat 07/15 12:16 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSE TO JUNE 30, 2023 OSC re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: failure to prosecute 13 filed by In re Debtor Allana Baroni. (Attorney Richard L Antognini added to party Allana Baroni(pty:db))(Antognini, Richard)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Response Sat 07/15 12:04 AM
RESPONSE filed by In re Debtor Allana Baronito Order to Show Cause,12 (Antognini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
13 13 motion Show Cause Sat 07/15 12:01 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order to Show Cause re: failure to prosecute filed by apellant James Baroni. (Antognini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 06/30 12:34 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court ORDERS Appellants to SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Appellants may discharge this OSC by filing their Opening Brief by no later than JULY 14, 2023. (iv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
11 11 bankruptcy Notice Re: Bankruptcy Record Complete (CV-8) - optional html form Thu 04/20 3:44 PM
NOTICE RE: BANKRUPTCY RECORD COMPLETE. Please note, pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 8010(b)(3), this Court has received from the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court either the record for the above-captioned appeal or notice that the record is available electronically. The parties are responsible for reading and complying with all requirements, including briefing, provided in this notice. Appellant must serve and file a brief by 5/22/2023. (iv)
Related: [-]
10 10 appeal Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability Thu 04/20 3:41 PM
Notice of Bankruptcy Appeal Record Availability re Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment,1 . (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
9 9 bankruptcy Notice of Document Discrepancy (Bankruptcy Appeal) Mon 03/27 11:56 AM
NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY APPEAL DOCUMENT DISCREPANCY regarding Statement of Issues, Designation of Record, Notice of Transcript forwarded to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
8 8 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 03/22 11:22 PM
OPPOSITION filed by Appellant James Baroni.(Antognini, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Antognini dec in response to OSC
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
7 7 order Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34) Wed 03/15 12:34 PM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-10431-MWF. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01812-MWF. Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
6 6 10 pgs order Order Wed 03/15 10:32 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. To secure the just, speedy, and inexpensive determination of every action, Fed. R. Civ. P. 1, all counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. (see document for further details) (bm)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Related Case(s) Tue 03/14 12:20 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Chapter 7 Trustee and Appellee David Seror. Related Case(s): 2:22-cv-07414-MWF; 2:22-cv-06985-MWF; 2:22-cv-06867-MWF; 2:20-cv-04338-MWF; 2:19-cv-07548-MWF; 2:18-cv-10431-MWF; 2:23-cv-01818-CJC (Seflin, Susan)
Related: [-]
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 03/14 10:51 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
3 3 bankruptcy Notice Regarding Appeal from Bankruptcy Court (CV-26) - optional html form Tue 03/14 10:51 AM
NOTICE REGARDING APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. The appeal has been assigned to Judge Percy Anderson. Refer to the Notice for specifics. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/14 10:03 AM
NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT. (jtil)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court Order/Judgment Tue 03/14 9:55 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL: filed by Appellants James Baroni, Richard L. Antognini and Allana Baroni. Re: Order on Trustees Motion for a Protective Order and For Monetary Sanctions Pursuant to Rule 26 entered on 2/10/2023 by Bankruptcy Judge Martin R. Barash, filed in the Bankruptcy Court on 3/3/2023. Bankruptcy Court case number: 1:12-bk-10986, Adversary number: None, BAP case number: CC 23-1041 (jtil)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 BK Docket