Brandon Christopher Williams et al v. Jenkins et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando M Olguin |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01886 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 17, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P)
Mon 03/20 2:50 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES2 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Request is DENIED. This case is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (iv) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
order
Appoint Counsel
Thu 03/16 10:41 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick denying4 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel. Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Counsel, et al., filed March 13, 2023, is denied without prejudice. The action does not appear to be complex and no exceptional circumstances exist. (See document for further details) (vmun) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
cs_rasgn
Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89)
Tue 03/14 5:03 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01886 FMO(E). (rn) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 12:45 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Appointment of Counsel
Tue 03/14 12:44 PM
MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Plaintiffs John Gary Gray, Brandon Christopher Williams. (car) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P)
Tue 03/14 12:33 PM
Declaration in Support of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff John Gary Gray. (car) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P)
Tue 03/14 12:31 PM
Declaration in Support of Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Brandon Christopher Williams. (car) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Prisoner Civil Rights)
Tue 03/14 12:26 PM
CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, filed by Plaintiffs Brandon Christopher Williams, John Gary Gray. (car) (car) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Att: 2 (3/14/2023) Lodged Proposed Order |