California Central District Court
Judge:Jesus G Bernal
Referred: Sheri Pym
Case #: 5:23-cv-00442
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2023
Terminated:May 25, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Sep 10, 2023 2:12 AM PDT
Defendant
Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By
Nicole Y. Blohm
Merserve Mumper And Hughes LLP
contact info
Jonathan H. Semerjian
Meserve Mumper And Hughes LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Herbert Lantz
Represented By
Diana Negin Massaband
Diana Massaband Law Offices
contact info
Phillip S Bather
Darraslaw
contact info
Susan B Grabarsky
Darraslaw
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order Tue 06/27 8:04 PM
ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation to Dismiss Entire Action with Prejudice17 . IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs in this matter. (twdb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
17 17 stip Dismiss Case Tue 06/13 3:54 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Semerjian, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, June 12, 2023
16 16 stip Continue Mon 06/12 4:02 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Jurisdiction and Deadline to File Dismissal with Court from 6/12/2023 to 6/26/2023 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 14 filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz.(Bather, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order re Stip to Retain Jurisdiction an Additional 14 days
15 15 attorney Change of Address Mon 06/12 3:54 PM
NOTICE of Change of address by Phillip S Bather attorney for Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. Changing attorneys address to 4686 Ontario Mills Parkway, Suite 201, Ontario, CA 91764. Filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Bather, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
14 14 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 05/25 1:07 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. In light of the Notice of Tentative Settlement filed May 12, 202313 , indicating that the case has tentatively settled in its entirety, this action is placed in inactive status. By June 12, 2023, the parties shall file either (1) a proper stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of June 13, 2023. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JS-6). THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
13 13 notice Settlement Fri 05/12 10:37 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Bather, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/29 5:07 PM
Notice of Court's Standing Order filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Bather, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 03/27 12:48 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 5/12/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Jonathan H. Semerjian added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Semerjian, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
10 10 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Fri 03/24 4:03 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 3/22/2023, answer due 4/12/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Diana Ruiz, Intake Specialist of CT Corporation Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 03/22 1:30 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/16 11:47 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 03/15 5:42 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 03/15 5:41 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 03/15 5:41 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Tue 03/14 5:39 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Bather, Phillip)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 03/14 5:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Bather, Phillip)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/14 5:37 PM
Certification & NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz, (Bather, Phillip)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/14 5:33 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34956673 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Herbert Lantz. (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party Herbert Lantz(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip)
Related: [-]