Westminster Crossing, L.P. v. Gwendalyn Nicholson et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John W Holcomb |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00436 |
Nature of Suit | 230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment |
Cause | 28:1443(1) Notice of Removal - Rent, Lease & Ejectment |
Case Filed: | Mar 10, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 06, 2023 1:48 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Gwendalyn Nicholson
7122 Westminster Boulevard, No 207
Westminster, CA 92683 |
|
Plaintiff
Westminster Crossing, L.P.
7122 Westminster Blvd., No 207
Westminster, CA 92683 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 3:32 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court of CA County of Orange. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court of CA County of Orange. (yl) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Tue 03/14 11:57 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 11:55 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Tue 03/14 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John W. Holcomb and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Remand Case to State Court
Wed 03/15 3:28 PM
*AMENDED* ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge John W. Holcomb. ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge John W. Holcomb. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the REQUEST for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis is DENIED. This case is REMANDED to the state court as explained in the attached order. |
|
7 | 7
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 03/15 2:29 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge John W. Holcomb. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the3 APPLICATION To Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs is DENIED. This case is REMANDED to the state court as explained in the attached order. (See document for further details) |
|
Friday, March 10, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 03/14 11:51 AM
APPLICATION To Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Defendant Gwendalyn Nicholson. (car) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 11:49 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Gwendalyn Nicholson, (car) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 03/14 11:47 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA County of Orange, case number 30-02022 01291549-CL-UD-CJC with Conformed copy of summons and complaint.Case assigned to Judge John W. Holcomb, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, filed by Defendant Gwendalyn Nicholson. (car) Modified on 3/14/2023 (car) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |