Paul Sapan v. Veritas Funding, LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Cormac J Carney |
Referred: | Autumn D Spaeth |
Case #: | 8:23-cv-00468 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 5:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
Veritas Funding, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Sapan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 10/04 2:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS0 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of an Action (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1))24 . Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (twdb) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Wed 10/04 11:38 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Paul Sapan. Dismissal is with prejudice. |
|
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 10/02 1:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 10/5/2023. (twdb) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Thu 08/31 3:17 PM
ORDER Granting Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendant to Respond to Complaint (30 days or less)21 , by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Response due on or before 9/29/23. (twdb) |
|
21 | 21
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Thu 08/31 11:22 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Veritas Funding, LLC answer now due 9/29/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Veritas Funding, LLC.(Hill, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 08/18 7:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Cormac J. Carney: ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. The Court ORDERS Defendant to file a response to Plaintiffs Complaint by August 31, 2023. (twdb) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 08/15 3:58 PM
ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, re Stipulation to Set Aside Default18 : Good cause appearing, the Court now orders the Entry of Default by Clerk [Dckt. No. 12] is hereby STRICKEN. (bm) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Set Aside Default
Fri 08/11 3:30 PM
STIPULATION to Set Aside Default as to Veritas Funding, LLC filed by Plaintiff Paul Sapan. |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
13
pgs
order
Certify Class Action
Fri 07/28 4:27 PM
ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION14 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Plaintiff's motion for class certification is DENIED. Plaintiff may file a motion for default judgment on behalf of himself alone by August 11, 2023. Failure to file a motion by that date will result in dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS.) (rolm) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Appearance
Wed 07/12 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher S Hill on behalf of Defendant Veritas Funding, LLC (Attorney Christopher S Hill added to party Veritas Funding, LLC(pty:dft))(Hill, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 07/06 7:57 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class prior to filing Application for Default 14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed document was not submitted or was not submitted as a separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
4
pgs
motion
Certify Class Action
Wed 07/05 1:09 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class prior to filing Application for Default filed by plaintiff Paul Sapan. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Prato, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum points and authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Justin Prato, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Paul Sapan, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration Chris Reichman, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 3 | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 06/28 12:02 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney. On 06/26/2023, the clerk entered default12 as to the defendant. Plaintiff is hereby directed to file a motion for default judgment within one week of this order. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrp) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Mon 06/26 10:39 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to VERITAS FUNDING, LLC, (twdb) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Fri 06/23 9:29 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant Veritas Funding, LLC filed by plaintiff Paul Sapan. (Prato, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Justin Prato | ||
10 | 10
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Fri 06/23 9:25 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Paul Sapan, upon Defendant Veritas Funding, LLC served on 3/28/2023, answer due 4/18/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Heidi Robinson, Manager for Veritas Funding LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Prato, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 06/21 1:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Here, 90 days have passed since Plaintiff filed the Complaint, yet no proof of service has been filed. Accordingly, the Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than June 23, 2023 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. See minute order for details. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 2:17 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Veritas Funding, LLC. (car) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:07 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:07 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 2:06 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (car) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 03/14 5:32 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Paul Sapan. |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 03/14 5:31 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Paul Sapan, |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 03/14 5:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Paul Sapan. |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 03/14 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34956644 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Paul Sapan. (Attorney Christopher J Reichman added to party Paul Sapan(pty:pla)) |