Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 3:23-mj-01143
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2023
Terminated:Mar 22, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 15, 2023 3:23 AM EDT
Defendant
James Darrell Hickox (1)
Represented By
George T. Fallis
Law Office Of Thomas G. Fallis
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
William Stephen Hamilton
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/13/2024 9:49 AM EDT
Monday, March 13, 2023
Arrest of James Darrell Hickox on 3/10/2023 (TSP)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to James Darrell Hickox (1). (TSP)
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for In Person proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey: Initial Appearance as to James Darrell Hickox held on 3/13/2023. (Digital) (TSP)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORAL MOTION for Detention by USA as to James Darrell Hickox. (TSP)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL (granting 3 Oral Motion for Detention) as to James Darrell Hickox (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey on 3/13/2023. (TSP)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF HEARING as to James Darrell Hickox: Preliminary Hearing set for 3/23/2023 at 02:00 PM in Jacksonville Courtroom 5 A before Magistrate Judge Joel B. Toomey. (TSP)
Related: [-]