Nevada District Court
Judge:Gloria M Navarro
Referred: Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:23-cv-00404
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2023
Terminated:Jul 15, 2024
Case in other court:Second Judicial District Court Nevada, CV23-00289
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:03 AM PDT
Defendant
Joseph Hayes
Represented By
Joel D. Odou
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Susana Santana
Wood Smith Henning & Berman, LLP
contact info
Analise N. M. Tilton
Wood Smith Henning & Berman, LLP
contact info
Kyle Joseph Hoyt
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Manuel Gurule
Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Knight Transportation, Inc.
Represented By
Joel D. Odou
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Susana Santana
Wood Smith Henning & Berman, LLP
contact info
Analise N. M. Tilton
Wood Smith Henning & Berman, LLP
contact info
Kyle Joseph Hoyt
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Manuel Gurule
Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.
Wood Smith Henning & Berman Joel D. Odou 2881 Business Park Court Suite 200
Las Vegas, NV 89128
Represented By
Joel D. Odou
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Susana Santana
Wood Smith Henning & Berman, LLP
contact info
Analise N. M. Tilton
Wood Smith Henning & Berman, LLP
contact info
Kyle Joseph Hoyt
Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Manuel Gurule
Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
James Patrick Vessells
Represented By
John Greene
Vannah & Vannah
contact info
Robert D. Vannah
Vannah & Vannah
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, July 15, 2024
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/16 11:47 AM
ORDER Granting37 Stipulation for Dismissal. Pursuant to the foregoing Stipulation, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed, with prejudice, in Case No. 2:23-cv-00404- GMN-EJY. The parties are to bear their own attorney fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is kindly instructed to close the case. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/15/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
37 37 motion Stipulation Fri 07/12 3:42 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL Stipulation and Order for Dismissal of Complaint by Defendants Joseph Hayes, Knight Transportation, Inc., Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.. (Hoyt, Kyle) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
36 36 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/17 2:16 PM
ANSWER to Complaint Defendant Knight Transportation, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Knight Transportation, Inc..(Hoyt, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
35 35 notice Notice Other Wed 04/24 11:08 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Alexandra J. Matloff by Joseph Hayes, Knight Transportation, Inc., Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.. (Matloff, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
33 33 7 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 04/22 12:57 PM
ORDER granting31 Stipulation For Extension Of Time. Discovery due by 7/9/2024. Motions due by 8/9/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/9/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/22/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List Mon 04/22 1:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/22/2024. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago. Before the Court is Defendants' Motion for Removal of Attorney from Electronic Service List. ECF No. 32 . Counsel for Defendants seek to remove Benjamin Gordon from the list of counsel for Defendants and from the electronic service system as he "is no longer involved in this case." Id. Defendants will continue to be represented by Joel D. Odou and Kyle Hoyt of Wood Smith Henning & Berman LLP. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Removal of Attorney from Electronic Service List (ECF No. 32 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court must remove Benjamin Gordon's name from CM/ECF and the docket so that he no longer receives electronic service of materials filed in this case. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
32 32 motion Motion Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List Fri 04/19 4:41 PM
MOTION to remove attorney Benjamin Gordon from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendants Knight Transportation, Inc., Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.. (Hoyt, Kyle)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Stipulation Fri 04/19 4:31 PM
Fourth STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) Stipulation to Extend Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order (Fourth Request) by Defendants Knight Transportation, Inc., Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.. (Hoyt, Kyle) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 16, 2024
30 30 7 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Tue 02/20 2:21 PM
ORDER Granting29 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 5/10/2024. Motions due by 6/10/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/16/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RJDG)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Stipulation Fri 02/16 12:22 PM
Third STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) to Extend Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Joseph Hayes, Knight Transportation, Inc., Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.. (Gordon, Benjamin) (extend) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
28 28 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Tue 02/13 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Benjamin Bradwell Gordon on behalf of Defendants Joseph Hayes, Knight Transportation, Inc., Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.. (Gordon, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
26 26 6 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 09/21 10:55 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER Granting25 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/11/2024. Motions due by 4/10/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/21/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG)
Related: [-]
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Thu 09/21 12:01 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (EDS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
25 25 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Wed 09/20 4:44 PM
Second Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Knight Transportation, Inc., Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc... (Hoyt, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 15, 2023
24 24 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 06/15 11:57 AM
ORDER Granting23 Stipulated Discovery Plan. Discovery due by 12/11/2023. Motions due by 1/10/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/9/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 6/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMMi)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 06/15 8:08 AM
First Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Knight Transportation, Inc., Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc... (Hoyt, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
minord Minute Order Order on Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List Mon 04/17 8:33 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/17/2023. By Law Clerk: C. Ponder. Before the Court is Defendants' Motion for Removal of Only Attorneys Susana Santana and Annalise N. M. Tilton from the Electronic Service List. ECF No. 15 . The Motion demonstrates that Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman, LLP will continue to serve as defense counsel while attorneys Santana and Tilton are either being reassigned or separating from the firm. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Removal of Only Attorneys Susana Santana and Annalise N. M. Tilton from the Electronic Service List (ECF No. 15 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court will remove Susana Santana and Annalise N. M. Tiltons names from CM/ECF and the docket so that they no longer receive electronic service of materials filed in this case. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CMP)
Related: [-]
notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Mon 04/17 11:51 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (LOE)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
21 21 5 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Mon 04/17 10:24 AM
ORDER Granting17 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 9/11/2023. Motions due by 10/11/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
20 20 15 pgs order Order on Stipulated Protective Order Mon 04/17 10:22 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. ORDER Granting16 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Status Report Fri 04/14 2:28 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Joseph Hayes, Knight Transportation, Inc., Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc... (Hoyt, Kyle)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Fri 04/14 2:26 PM
First Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendants Joseph Hayes, Knight Transportation, Inc., Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc... (Hoyt, Kyle)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Stipulated Protective Order Fri 04/14 2:23 PM
First STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER and Confidentiality Agreement by Defendants Joseph Hayes, Knight Transportation, Inc., Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc... (Hoyt, Kyle)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Motion Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List Fri 04/14 12:41 PM
MOTION to remove attorney Susana Santana and Analise N. M. Tilton from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendants Joseph Hayes, Knight Transportation, Inc., Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.. (Santana, Susana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
14 14 misc Statement in Removal Case Thu 03/30 3:07 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc...(Tilton, Analise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, March 27, 2023
13 13 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Mon 03/27 11:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kyle Joseph Hoyt on behalf of Defendants Joseph Hayes, Knight Transportation, Inc., Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.. (Hoyt, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
12 12 notice Notice Other Thu 03/23 4:21 PM
NOTICE SERVICE OF MINUTES OF THE COURT DATED MARCH 15, 2023 by Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc. re6 Minute Order Removal Case,..(Tilton, Analise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
11 11 misc Jury Demand Tue 03/21 4:28 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Joseph Hayes. (Tilton, Analise)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate Interested Parties Tue 03/21 4:28 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Joseph Hayes. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Tilton, Analise)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Petition for Removal Tue 03/21 4:25 PM
ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal,, DEFENDANT JOSEPH HAYES ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT filed by Joseph Hayes.(Tilton, Analise)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
8 8 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 03/16 2:31 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by James Patrick Vessells. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Greene, John)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Docket Correction Thu 03/16 1:21 PM
DISREGARD - ENTERED IN ERROR NOTICE of Docket Correction - Based on the to 1 Petition for Removal, the inclusive Civil Cover sheet and the included Complaint filed in state court, there has been no DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL. Either party may file a Jury Demand, but one has not been made to date, and the Jury option will return to NONE at this time. (no image attached) (DRS) Modified on 3/16/2023 (DRS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
6 6 minord Minute Order Removal Case Wed 03/15 1:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/15/2023. By Deputy Clerk: L. Ortiz. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/30/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/14/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Petition for Removal Wed 03/15 11:53 AM
DEFENDANT KNIGHT-SWIFT TRANSPORTATION HOLDINGS, INC.S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/25/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/29/2023.(Tilton, Analise)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Jury Demand Wed 03/15 11:06 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.. (Tilton, Analise)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 03/15 11:03 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Tilton, Analise)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Wed 03/15 10:49 AM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court Nevada, Case Number CV23-00289, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7236366) by Knight-Swift Transportation Holdings, Inc.. Proof of service due by 5/16/2023. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/25/2023. (Tilton, Analise)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cove Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Wed 03/15 1:45 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (LOE)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Wed 03/15 1:46 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]