West Virginia Northern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cv-00072
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2023
Defendant
Jeffrey D. Cramer
Plaintiff
Saul Vega

GPO Feb 01 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Trumble on 2/1/2024. Copy sent certified mail, return receipt to pro se Plaintiff. (tlg) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/1/2024: # (1) Certified Mail Return Receipt) (tlg).
GPO Jun 24 2024
) Certified Mail Return Receipt) (cmd).ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION AND ADOPTING 30 THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by District Judge Gina M Groh on 6/24/2024. Copy to pro se pls by cm,rrr.(cmd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/24/2024: # (1


Create an account to get the full docket for this case.