Joshua Cuevas v. Christopher H. Crowe
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Wesley L Hsu |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01926 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Christopher H. Crowe
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Cuevas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, May 25, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Joshua Cuevas. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-042) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01926 WLH(MRWx). (rn) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court has reviewed and considered Plaintiff's response to the Court's Order to Show Cause12 . In light of the foregoing, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state claims asserted in the Complaint. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (lom) |
|
Friday, March 31, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Joshua Cuevasto Order to Show Cause,10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court finds that there is good cause to institute a limited scheduling order concerning basic case prosecution for cases filed by the So. Cal. Firm. (iv) |
|
10 | 10
![]() MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why this Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the other state law claims alleged by Plaintiff. The Response shall be filed on or before MARCH 31, 2023. (iv) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Christopher H. Crowe. (car) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Joshua Cuevas. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joshua Cuevas. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34959707 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Joshua Cuevas(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |