California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: Michael R Wilner
Case #: 2:23-cv-01926
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2023
Terminated:May 25, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:45 AM PDT
Defendant
Christopher H. Crowe
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Joshua Cuevas
Represented By
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, May 25, 2023
15 15 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 05/25 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Joshua Cuevas. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
14 14 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Mon 05/22 12:26 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-042) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01926 WLH(MRWx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines Tue 04/11 12:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court has reviewed and considered Plaintiff's response to the Court's Order to Show Cause12 . In light of the foregoing, the Court, in its discretion, declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's state claims asserted in the Complaint. The Court therefore dismisses any such claims without prejudice. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
12 12 misc Response Fri 03/31 4:38 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Joshua Cuevasto Order to Show Cause,10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Friday, March 17, 2023
11 11 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Fri 03/17 1:56 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PROSECUTION OF CERTAIN CASES UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Court finds that there is good cause to institute a limited scheduling order concerning basic case prosecution for cases filed by the So. Cal. Firm. (iv)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 03/17 1:54 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing as to why this Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the other state law claims alleged by Plaintiff. The Response shall be filed on or before MARCH 31, 2023. (iv)
Related: [-]
9 9 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Fri 03/17 9:34 AM
NOTICE to Parties Re (ADR-20) ADA Disability Access Litigation/Application for Stay and Early Mediation: PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED to serve the ADA Packet on Defendant(s) at the same time the summons and complaint are served, if possible. If, upon receipt of this Notice to Parties, Plaintiff has already served Defendant(s), Plaintiff must serve the ADA Packet no later than fourteen (14) days after this Notice to Parties is filed by the Court. Within three (3) days of serving Defendant(s), Plaintiff must file with the Court a proof of service indicating that the ADA Packet was served on Defendant(s). *See Notice for further details.* (smom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/16 3:27 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Christopher H. Crowe. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 03/16 2:54 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Thu 03/16 2:53 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 03/16 2:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
4 4 notice Summons Request Wed 03/15 11:25 AM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Joshua Cuevas. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/15 11:25 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 03/15 11:22 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Joshua Cuevas. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/15 11:21 AM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34959707 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Joshua Cuevas(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]