Joel Spence v. Jaddou Ur Mendoza et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00449 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
Susan M. Curda
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Corina Luna
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jaddou Ur Mendoza
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shuo Liu
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Shuo Liu. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Spence, Joel) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Joint Stipulation to Stay Case Pending Adjudication of Application8 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the instant action shall be stayed until May 15, 2024. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of Application filed by Defendants Susan M. Curda, Corina Luna, Jaddou Ur Mendoza.(Attorney Cedina M Kim added to party Susan M. Curda(pty:dft), Attorney Cedina M Kim added to party Corina Luna(pty:dft), Attorney Cedina M Kim added to party Jaddou Ur Mendoza(pty:dft))(Kim, Cedina) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Susan M. Curda, Corina Luna, Jaddou Ur Mendoza. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff SHUO LIU, (Spence, Joel) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SHUO LIU. (Spence, Joel) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff SHUO LIU. (Spence, Joel) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34959879 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff SHUO LIU. (Attorney Joel E. Spence added to party SHUO LIU(pty:pla))(Spence, Joel) |