Connecticut District Court
Judge:Omar A Williams
Referred: S Dave Vatti
Case #: 3:23-cv-00339
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2023
Terminated:Jun 14, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 10:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Porter and Chester Institute, Inc.
Represented By
Joseph William Fazzino
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Holly L. Cini
Jackson Lewis - P.C. Htfd, Ct
contact info
Plaintiff
Philbert Davenport
Represented By
James V. Sabatini
Sabatini & Associates
contact info

GPO Sep 20 2023
ORDER denying ECF No. 15, Motion to Remand to State Court. See attached for details. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 9/20/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, July 15, 2024
42 42 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 07/15 5:11 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case With Prejudice by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc.. (Cini, Holly)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
41 41 order Order Fri 06/14 10:36 AM
ORDER. The parties having agreed to settle this matter, see ECF No. 40, the Clerk of Court respectfully is asked to administratively close this case in accordance with Local Rule 41(b). Either party may move to reopen the case on or before July 15, 2024. If the parties wish to file a stipulation of dismissal, they may do so on or before July 15, 2024. The dates in this order may be extended for good cause upon a motion filed in accordance with Local Rule 7(b). If no stipulation of dismissal is filed by the deadline noted herein, the action will be deemed dismissed with prejudice without any further order of the court. The court thanks Judge Spector for his time and attention in this matter. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 6/14/24. (Wagner, R)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Fri 06/14 1:07 PM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/14 1:08 PM
Set Deadline: Stipulation of Dismissal/Re-Open deadline: 7/15/2024. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
40 40 minutes Settlement Conference Thu 06/13 5:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: A Settlement Conference via Zoom was held on 6/13/2024. Total Time: 2 hours and 45 minutes. This case has settled after a settlement conference today. The parties understand that the District Judge may decide to close this case administratively under Local Rule 41(b) . (Spears, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
39 39 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 06/03 11:27 AM
ORDER granting ECF No.38 , Motion for Extension of Time. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before July 31, 2024, and the parties' joint trial memorandum shall be filed on or before August 30, 2024. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 6/3/24. (Wagner, R)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/03 4:00 PM
Set Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 7/31/2024; Joint Trial Memorandum due by 8/30/2024. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
38 38 motion Extension of Time Fri 05/31 4:15 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Deadline to file Dispositive Motions and Joint Trial Memorandum by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc.. (Fazzino, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
37 37 3 pgs order Order Wed 05/22 4:53 PM
ORDER: A Settlement Conference via Zoom is scheduled in this case for June 13, 2024 at 11:00 AM . Please see the attached Settlement Conference Order for detailed instructions and deadlines . Signed by Judge Robert M. Spector on May 22, 2024. (Spears, A)
Related: [-]
36 36 utility Calendar Entry Wed 05/22 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A Settlement Conference via Zoom is set for June 13, 2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge Robert M. Spector. (Spears, A)
Related: [-]
35 35 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 05/22 4:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert M. Spector: A telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference was held on 5/22/2024. 5 minutes. (Spears, A)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
34 34 utility Calendar Entry Tue 05/21 9:19 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. A telephonic Pre-Settlement Conference is set for May 22, 2024 at 04:30 PM before Judge Robert M. Spector. A date for the settlement conference will be set during the telephone call. As the Court requires parties or their representatives with settlement authority to attend (in-person or by remote means) the settlement conference, counsel should obtain dates of unavailability from their clients over the next 60 days and have their own calendars available to aid in the scheduling. During the telephone call, counsel should be prepared to discuss what information needs to be exchanged and anything else that needs to be accomplished prior to the settlement conference for the discussions to be productive. Please use the following dial-in for this call: (877) 873-8017; Access Code: 7040261 . (Spears, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
33 33 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 05/20 3:11 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Robert M. Spector for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 5/20/24. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
32 32 misc Status Report Thu 05/16 3:07 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc.. (Cini, Holly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
31 31 order Order Wed 05/01 3:49 PM
ORDER. The parties are instructed to submit a status report on or before May 17, 2024, that addresses (1) whether they were able to meet the deadline for the completion of discovery, which was set for April 30, 2024; (2) whether there are any outstanding discovery disputes; and (3) whether the parties are interested in a referral to a United States Magistrate Judge for a settlement conference. The parties may include any additional information pertaining to the pendency of the action that they agree should be brought to the attention of the court. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 5/1/24. (Wagner, R)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/02 11:49 AM
Set Deadline: Status Report due by 5/17/2024. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/16 2:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent F. Sabatini on behalf of Philbert Davenport (Sabatini, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/11 9:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew V. Bertolino on behalf of Philbert Davenport (Bertolino, Matthew)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Thu 04/11 4:03 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge S. Dave Vatti: Telephonic Conference re: defendant's23 Motion to Compel held on 4/11/2024. Total time: 7 minutes. (Nichols, J)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Compel Thu 04/11 4:14 PM
ORDER granting defendant's23 Motion to Compel to which plaintiff does not object. Plaintiff shall produce the outstanding discovery by April 25, 2024 . The parties will proceed with plaintiff's deposition as scheduled, which defendant may hold open and reconvene in connection with any discovery compliance produced thereafter. So Ordered. Signed by Judge S. Dave Vatti on 4/11/2024. (Nichols, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
utility Calendar Entry Mon 04/08 11:24 AM
NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. A Telephonic Conference re:23 Motion to Compel is set for 4/11/2024 at 3:00 p.m. before Judge S. Dave Vatti. Counsel should dial 866-434-5269 , to connect to the conference and enter access code 2006808 . (Ellis, B)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 04/05 4:42 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti for ruling on23 MOTION to Compel . Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 4/5/24. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
24 24 8 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 04/02 11:52 AM
Memorandum in Support re23 MOTION to Compel filed by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc..(Cini, Holly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-C
23 23 motion Compel Tue 04/02 11:49 AM
MOTION to Compel by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc..Responses due by 4/23/2024 (Cini, Holly)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 11/30 1:08 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.21 , Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall disclose expert witnesses and reports on or before February 29, 2024. The court reminds the parties that, per the scheduling order, see ECF No. 19, interim discovery deadlines may be modified by agreement without the court's approval. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 11/30/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
21 21 motion Extension of Time Mon 11/27 2:52 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 29, 2024 In Which To Disclose Expert Witnesses by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc.. (Cini, Holly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 20, 2023
20 20 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Wed 09/20 3:50 PM
ORDER denying ECF No.15 , Motion to Remand to State Court. See attached for details. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 9/20/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 05/01 3:55 PM
ORDER. The court thanks the parties for their Local Rule 26(f) Report. See ECF No. 31 . The court hereby APPROVES and ADOPTS all deadlines proposed therein, as modified herein. All discovery shall be completed on or before April 30, 2024, and all interim discovery deadlines hereby are incorporated by reference. Accordingly, Defendant's motion for extension of time to provide initial disclosure, see ECF No.17 , hereby is granted. All interim discovery deadlines may be amended by agreement of the parties without the court's approval provided those amendments do not delay the deadline for completion of all discovery. At this early point, the court does not see the utility in setting a post-discovery telephonic status conference and so will decline to do so. The parties may move for an audience with the court as necessary and appropriate. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before June 30, 2024. The parties' joint trial memorandum shall be filed on or before July 30, 2024, if no dispositive motions are filed, or within the period set by the court upon its disposition of any dispositive motions that are filed. Any motions for summary judgment will follow the usual briefing schedule. The parties may move to extend any briefing deadlines as necessary and appropriate. The court thereafter will set a jury selection date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to trial on September 30, 2024. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 5/1/23. (Wagner, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 05/01 3:57 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 4/30/2024 Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2024 Trial Brief due by 7/30/2024 Trial Ready Date 9/30/2024 (Wagner, Rebecca)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
18 18 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 04/28 2:42 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cini, Holly)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
17 17 motion Extension of Time Fri 04/21 11:21 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time until May 22, 2023 In Which To Serve Initial Discovery Protocols by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc.. (Cini, Holly)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
16 16 30+ pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 04/18 5:00 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re15 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc..(Fazzino, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-E
Friday, March 31, 2023
15 15 motion Remand to State Court Fri 03/31 5:55 PM
First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Philbert Davenport.Responses due by 4/21/2023 (Sabatini, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Wed 03/22 4:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) With Affirmative Defenses by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc..(Fazzino, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
13 13 order Electronic Service Documents Thu 03/16 3:10 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of1 Notice of Removal, filed by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc.,11 Protective Order,3 Notice of Appearance filed by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc.,2 Notice of Appearance filed by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc.,7 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc.,6 Notice (Other) filed by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc.,10 Electronic Filing Order,4 Notice (Other) filed by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc.,9 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 8 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,,5 Notice (Other) filed by Porter and Chester Institute, Inc.,12 Order Signed by Clerk on 3/16/2023.(Barry, L)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/16 3:38 PM
Set Deadline: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/28/2023. (Velez, F.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/16 3:07 PM
Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2023.(Barry, L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Initial Discovery Protocol Attachment
11 11 order Protective Order Thu 03/16 2:40 PM
Standing PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 3/15/2023. (Barry, L)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Electronic Filing Order Thu 03/16 2:38 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 3/15/2023.(Barry, L)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Thu 03/16 2:37 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/14/2023 Discovery due by 9/14/2023 Dispositive Motions due by 10/19/2023 Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2023.(Barry, L)
Related: [-]
8 8 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2023.(Perez, J.)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/15 4:19 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Porter and Chester Institute, Inc.. (Fazzino, Joseph)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/15 4:16 PM
NOTICE by The Porter and Chester Institute, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, Statement Regarding Removal (Cini, Holly)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/15 4:11 PM
NOTICE by The Porter and Chester Institute, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Pending Motions (Cini, Holly)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/15 4:06 PM
NOTICE by The Porter and Chester Institute, Inc. re1 Notice of Removal, Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Petition for Removal(Cini, Holly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/15 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph William Fazzino on behalf of The Porter and Chester Institute, Inc. (Fazzino, Joseph)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/15 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Holly L. Cini on behalf of The Porter and Chester Institute, Inc. (Cini, Holly)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 03/15 3:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Porter and Chester Institute, Inc. from Superior Court Judicial District of Fairfield, case number FBY-CV22-6119143-S. Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACTDC-7273978, filed by The Porter and Chester Institute, Inc..(Cini, Holly)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 30 pgs Exhibit A
notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Wed 03/15 4:34 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, any nongovernmental corporate party must electronically file a disclosure statement that identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock or states that there is no such corporation. Such disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 3/15/2023.(Perez, J.)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/16 12:03 PM
Judge Omar A. Williams and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]