Korttney Elliott v. MMOS, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sunshine Suzanne Sykes |
Referred: | Shashi H Kewalramani |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00450 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Aug 14, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2023 1:49 AM PDT |
Defendant
MMOS, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Korttney Elliott
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, August 11, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Korttney Elliott. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 07/12 3:39 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Response to Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution [Dkt. 11], wherein counsel for Plaintiff provides an update on the service of process and requests additional time to effectuate service of Defendant MMOS, Inc. The Court hereby GRANTS the request for an extension of time to effectuate service of process. Plaintiff is hereby DIRECTED to file its Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint, no later than August 11, 2023. If Plaintiff requires additional time, Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file an appropriate motion seeking the desired relief. The Court further EXTENDS the OSC deadline to August 11, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Korttney Elliottto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,,10 re: Lack of Service (Kim, Jason) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. The Court, on its own motion, hereby orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before July 10, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed, with respect to each Defendant who has not been served, for lack of prosecution. Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court finds that this matter is appropriate for submission without oral argument. This Order to Show Cause will be discharged if Plaintiff files, before the deadline set forth above, a proof of service of the summons and complaint. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) |
|
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant MMOS, Inc. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Korttney Elliott. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Korttney Elliott. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34960729 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Korttney Elliott(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |