Berthy Lopez et al v. Amazon PSP1 et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sunshine Suzanne Sykes |
Referred: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00451 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Mar 23, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
Amazon
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amazon PSP1
|
|
Defendant
DOES
|
|
Defendant
Golden State FC, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Berthy Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Real Party In Interest Defendant
Amazon.com Services LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, March 24, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Fri 03/24 9:58 AM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Riverside Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Riverside Superior Court. (shb) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order Remand Case to State Court
Fri 03/24 9:51 AM
ORDER LIMITING AMOUNT IN CONTROVERSY AND DAMAGES RECOVERABLE AND REMANDING ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. §1447(c),9 by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: The Court orders that: (1) Plaintiff waives, and is hereby estopped from asserting any right to seek, or to recover, in this lawsuit, including after remand to state court, or any other lawsuit arising out of or in any way based on Plaintiffs employment or separation from employment, a total amount in damages (including but not limited to special damages, economic damages, general damages, non-economic damages, punitive damages, interest, civil penalties, or statutory penalties), or any other categories of money, attorneys fees, costs, or interest combined in excess of $74,999, whether by way of settlement, judgment, order, verdict, or other resolution involving the transfer of any property, money, or other benefit to Plaintiff or her counsel by or against any Defendant named in this action or that may be named in the future, including any Doe defendant. (2) Plaintiff and Plaintiffs counsel collectively and individually waive, and are hereby estopped from asserting any right to seek, or to recover, any amount of attorneys fees attributable to Plaintiffs claims that would bring this total potential recovery or amount in controversy to exceed $74,999. (3) Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c) this action is hereby remanded to the Superior of the State of California, County of Riverside; and(4) Each party shall bear their own costs and fees, including attorneys fees, relating to the remand. IT IS SO ORDERED. Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (shb) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
4
pgs
stip
Order
Wed 03/22 5:40 PM
STIPULATION for Order Limiting Amount in Controversy and Damages Recoverable and Request for Remand Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c) filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC.(Bykerk, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:52 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:52 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 03/15 5:09 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 served on 3/15/2023. (Bykerk, Ryan) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC, identifying Amazon.com Services LLC. (Bykerk, Ryan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 2:50 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Real Party In Interest Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Bykerk, Ryan) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 2:33 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVRI2300534 Receipt No: ACACDC-34961583 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Amazon.com Services LLC. (Attorney Ryan Christopher Bykerk added to party Amazon.com Services LLC(pty:rpid))(Bykerk, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - All State Court Papers Served, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of RyanC. Bykerk, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration of Terri Pattillo, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration of Zane Brown | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 3:55 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Berthy Lopez in Riverside Superior Court on 2/2/2023, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) |