Texas Northern District Court
Judge:David L Horan
Case #: 3:23-cv-00575
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 10:18 AM CDT
Defendant
Paul G Comrie
Represented By
Jason Howard Friedman
Friedman & Feiger LLP
contact info
Richard W Winn
Friedman & Feiger LLP
contact info
John Locke Adair
Friedman & Feiger LLP
contact info
Defendant
Elements International Group LLC
Represented By
Jason Howard Friedman
Friedman & Feiger LLP
contact info
Richard W Winn
Friedman & Feiger LLP
contact info
John Locke Adair
Friedman & Feiger LLP
contact info
Defendant
Whitetail Capital LLC
Represented By
Jason Howard Friedman
Friedman & Feiger LLP
contact info
Richard W Winn
Friedman & Feiger LLP
contact info
John Locke Adair
Friedman & Feiger LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
William Riley Carter
Represented By
Margaret Angelita Delgadillo
Martin Powers & Counsel PLLC
contact info
Katherine M Anand
Martin Powers & Counsel, PLLC
contact info
Meagan Martin Powers
Martin Powers & Counsel PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Frances Elizabeth Valentine
Represented By
Margaret Angelita Delgadillo
Martin Powers & Counsel PLLC
contact info
Katherine M Anand
Martin Powers & Counsel, PLLC
contact info
Meagan Martin Powers
Martin Powers & Counsel PLLC
contact info

GPO Dec 06 2023
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The Court should deny Defendants' Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint [Dkt. No. 12]. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 12/6/2023) (mcrd)
GPO Dec 21 2023
Order Accepting 19 Findings and Recommendations on 12 Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants. Accordingly, Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 12 is denied. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/21/2023) (chmb)

Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
66 66 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/12 9:04 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT: The Court now ORDERS Plaintiffs to submit by 5/20/2025 a proposed final judgment consistent with the April 9 memorandum opinion and order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 5/12/2025) (axm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
65 65 appeal Notice of Appeal Tue 05/06 1:03 PM
NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to64 Memorandum Opinion and Order,,, Modify Hearings/Deadlines,, to the Fifth Circuit by Paul G Comrie, Elements International Group LLC, Whitetail Capital LLC. Filing fee $605, receipt number ATXNDC-15477965. T.O. form to appellant electronically at[LINK:Transcript Order Form] or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions[LINK:here] . (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (Friedman, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A