Arizona District Court
Judge:Michael T Liburdi
Case #: 2:23-cv-00455
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2023
Terminated:Jun 22, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:37 AM MST
Defendant
Adam Bain
Defendant
Cipora Herman
Defendant
Jonathan Jaffe
Defendant
Pueo Keffer
Defendant
Jason Kilar
Defendant
Opendoor Technologies Incorporated
Defendant
John Rice
Defendant
Glenn Solomon
Defendant
Carrie Wheeler
Defendant
Eric Wu
Plaintiff
Seth Van Dorn
Represented By
Jennifer Lynn Kroll
Martin & Bonnett PLLC
contact info
Gerald Barrett
Ward Keenan Barrett Pc - Central Ave Phoenix
contact info
Susan Joan Martin
Martin & Bonnett PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM MST
Thursday, June 22, 2023
11 11 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Thu 06/22 11:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Civil Case Terminated pursuant to Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, Doc. 23 in CV23-00367-PHX-MTL. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
10 10 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/03 9:53 AM
AMENDED ORDER TO TRANSFER - IT IS ORDERED that case number 2:23-CV-00367-GMS, consolidated with 2:23-CV-455-DMF, is hereby transferred to the Hon. Michael T. Liburdi, before whom the above related earlier-filed securities class action is pending, for all purposes, including trial. All future pleadings in the transferred action shall bear the following caption: In re Opendoor Technologies Inc. Stockholder Derivative Litigation, No. 2:23-CV-00367-MTL. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 5/3/23. (SMF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Related Case Tue 05/02 3:50 PM
ORDER granting (42) Motion to Transfer Related Case in case 2:22-cv-01717-MTL; granting 13 Motion to Transfer Related Case. in case 2:23-cv-00367-GMS; granting8 Motion to Transfer Related Case. in case 2:23-cv-00455-GMS. Case number 2:23-CV-00367-GMS, consolidated with 2:23-CV-455-DMF, is hereby transferred to the Hon. Michael T. Liburdi, before whom the above related earlier-filed securities class action is pending, for all purposes, including trial. All future pleadings in this consolidated action shall bear the following caption: In re Opendoor Technologies Inc. Securities Litigation, No. 2:22-CV 01717-MTL. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 5/2/23. (Associated Cases: 2:22-cv-01717-MTL, 2:23-cv-00367-GMS, 2:23-cv-00455-GMS) (SMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
8 8 motion Transfer Related Case Mon 05/01 4:35 PM
MOTION to Transfer Related Case by Ryan Carlson. **Redocket by the Clerk for statistical purposes. (Associated Cases: CV 23-00367 PHX-GMS, CV 23-00455 PHX-GMS, CV 22-01717 PHX-MTL) (DXD) *Modified filed date on 5/1/2023 (DXD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion Transfer Related Case Fri 04/28 10:50 AM
MOTION to Transfer Related Case by Seth Van Dorn, Ryan Carlson. (Associated Cases: CV 23-00367 PHX-GMS,CV 23-00455 PHX-DMF) (Barrett, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order To Transfer Pursuant to LRCiv 42.1
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
6 6 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Tue 03/21 3:55 PM
ORDER granting (8) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 2:23-cv-00367-GMS. The Related Derivative Actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including pre-trial proceedings and trial pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 42(a), under Case No. Case No.: 2:23-cv-00367-GMS (the "Consolidated Derivative Action"). Every pleading filed in the Consolidated Derivative Action, or in any separate action included herein, must bear the above caption. Rigrodsky Law, P.A. and Gainey McKenna & Egleston are hereby designated as Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel for the conduct of the Consolidated Derivative Action. Plaintiffs shall, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, file a consolidated complaint, which will be the operative complaint in the Consolidated Derivative Action. Defendants need not respond to the prior complaints filed in the Related Derivative Actions. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 3/20/23. (Associated Cases: 2:23-cv-00367-GMS, 2:23-cv-00455-DMF) (SMF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
5 5 motion Consolidate Cases Tue 03/21 3:26 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Ryan Carlson. (Associated Cases: CV-23-367-PHX-GMS, CV-23-455-PHX-DMF) (NOTE: This entry was re-docketed for statistical purposes using the proper LR 42 Motion to Consolidate Event)(SMF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 03/15 4:16 PM
Summons Issued as to Adam Bain, Cipora Herman, Jonathan Jaffe, Pueo Keffer, Jason Kilar, Opendoor Technologies Incorporated, John Rice, Glenn Solomon, Carrie Wheeler, Eric Wu.(JAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons
3 3 misc New Case Opened Wed 03/15 4:08 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21702579. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-455-PHX-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (JAM)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Wed 03/15 4:07 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Seth Van Dorn. (Kroll, Jennifer)(JAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons,
Att: 9 Summons
1 1 29 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 03/15 4:04 PM
VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21702579 filed by Seth Van Dorn. (Kroll, Jennifer)(JAM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet