Marvin Zuniga Johnson v. United States of America
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01941 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:2674 Federal Tort Claims Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:35 AM PDT |
Defendant
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marvin Zuniga Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Monday, March 25, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Mon 03/25 12:15 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: The Court is in receipt of the parties' Joint Stipulation to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates. Dkt.34 . The Court hereby continues the fact discovery cut-off for one month, from April 12, 2024 to May 13, 2024. All other deadlines identified in the Court's August 21, 2023 Order remain in place. See dkt. 21. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (npo) |
|
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
stip
Continue
Thu 03/14 5:50 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Pretrial and Trial Dates from September 10, 2024 to November 5, 2024 Re: Notice of Mediation Date(ADR-13)33 , Scheduling Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,21 filed by Plaintiff Marvin Zuniga Johnson.(Sharpe, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Continuing Pretrial and Trial Dates to Permit Settlement Negotiations | ||
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
adr
Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13)
Wed 03/06 4:45 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for April 29, 2024.(Breitman, Craig) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Statement
Thu 12/07 10:10 AM
STATEMENT Case Management filed by Plaintiff Marvin Zuniga Johnson re: Order31 . (Sharpe, Daniel) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
4
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/22 10:28 AM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: Please refer to the Order for complete details. (cbr) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Mon 11/20 2:30 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-112) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, this case is transferred from Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha to the calendar of Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01941-KK-RAOx. (ap) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
order
Protective Order
Wed 11/01 1:13 PM
AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver re Amended Stipulation for Protective Order25 . (See Order for further details). (eq) |
|
28 | 28
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 11/01 9:26 AM
Text Only Entry: Re Notice of Reassignment of Case Due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer27 , and Amended Stipulation for Protective Order25 . This case was recently assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. In accordance with L.R. 5-4.4.2, counsel is directed to email Word version of signed proposed protective order to RAO_chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov as soon as practicable. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dml) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
transfer
Reassignment of Case Due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer (MJ) (G-74) - optional html form
Tue 10/31 6:32 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as 2:23-cv-01941 FLA(RAOx). (rn) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 10/20 11:20 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory J Agron counsel for Defendant United States of America. Gregory J. Agron is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Agron, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
stip
Protective Order
Thu 10/19 11:15 AM
Amended STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant United States of America.(Fujii, Trent) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
stip
Protective Order
Fri 10/13 11:30 AM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendant United States of America.(Fujii, Trent) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 10/10 10:15 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Trent Kenzo Fujii counsel for Defendant United States of America. Adding Trent K. Fujii as counsel of record for Defendant for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Gregory J. Agron is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant United States of America. (Attorney Trent Kenzo Fujii added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Fujii, Trent) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form
Wed 10/04 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Craig R. Breitman has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 08/22 3:57 PM
ORDER RE: SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES, TRIAL REQUIREMENTS, ANDCONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/9/2024 01:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 9/10/2024 08:15 AM ; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 8/9/2024 at 01:00 PM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Mon 08/21 2:08 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 07/05/2024. (tf) |
|
19 | 19
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 08/21 2:07 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the court VACATES the September 1, 2023, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Fri 08/18 5:01 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 6-8 days, filed by Plaintiff Marvin Zuniga Johnson..(Sharpe, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 07/25 4:10 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 9/1/2023 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) |
|
Saturday, July 01, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Sat 07/01 6:04 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Agron, Gregory) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 05/30 10:59 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Fri 05/26 3:02 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to United States of America answer now due 6/22/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant United States of America.(Attorney Gregory J Agron added to party United States of America(pty:dft))(Agron, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Thu 03/23 12:10 PM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant United States of America. (lc) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/22 4:07 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,,11 filed by Plaintiff Marvin Zuniga Johnson. (Sharpe, Daniel) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Deficiency in Summons
Mon 03/20 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request4 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. Incorrect case number and Judge and Magistrate as "2:21-cv-07690-DSF(MARx)". Refer to Notice of Assignment 3/16/2023 docket no. 5. The correct case number is to read as: 2:23cv01941 FLA (AFMx). The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc) |
|
10 | 10
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Mon 03/20 2:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (NON-PRISONER CASE)3 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (lc) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 03/17 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marvin Zuniga Johnson, identifying Plaintiff Marvin Zuniga Johnson, Defendant United States of America, and unidentified employees of ICE that participated in the alleged incident. (Sharpe, Daniel) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening
Fri 03/17 11:24 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:45 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:45 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Wed 03/15 4:40 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Marvin Zuniga Johnson. (Sharpe, Daniel) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Wed 03/15 4:36 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Marvin Zuniga Johnson. (Sharpe, Daniel) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 4:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marvin Zuniga Johnson. (Sharpe, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 4:32 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Marvin Zuniga Johnson. (Attorney Daniel Christian Sharpe added to party Marvin Zuniga Johnson(pty:pla))(Sharpe, Daniel) |