Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Hugh Lawson
Referred: Thomas Q Langstaff
Case #: 7:23-cv-00028
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2023
Terminated:Mar 05, 2024
Petitioner
DARIEN JOSEPH MEHEUX
Respondent
JENNIFER CLARK
Respondent
TYRONE OLIVER

GPO Mar 05 2024
JUDGMENT of DISMISSAL. (ksl)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
14 14 order Judgment Tue 03/05 1:02 PM
JUDGMENT of DISMISSAL. (ksl)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Report and Recommendations Tue 03/05 10:36 AM
ORDER adopting12 Report and Recommendations; granting6 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE HUGH LAWSON on 3/5/2024. (aks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
12 12 motion Report and Recommendation Wed 01/03 4:08 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re6 MOTION to Dismiss petition as untimely. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 1/3/2024. (TQL)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
11 11 respm Response to Motion Mon 06/26 11:59 PM
RESPONSE filed by DARIEN JOSEPH MEHEUX re6 MOTION to Dismiss petition as untimely (BULLARD, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 06/05 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BRANDON BULLARD on behalf of DARIEN JOSEPH MEHEUX (BULLARD, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs order Order for Response to Motion Mon 06/05 11:27 AM
ORDER for Petitioner to respond to6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Respondent. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 6/5/2023. (TQL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 02, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 06/02 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by BETH A BURTON on behalf of TYRONE OLIVER Attorney BETH A BURTON added to party TYRONE OLIVER(pty:res)(BURTON, BETH)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/02 8:43 AM
NOTICE of Filing by TYRONE OLIVER(HEADRICK, ASHLEIGH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex 1 a copy of Petitioners final disposition; i.e. sentence.,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex 2 a copy of the Georgia Supreme Courts dismissal of Petitioners second attempted appeal under Cook v. State, 313 Ga. 471, 870 S.E.2d 758 (2022).
6 6 motion Dismiss Fri 06/02 8:41 AM
MOTION to Dismiss petition as untimely by TYRONE OLIVER filed by ASHLEIGH DENE HEADRICK.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(HEADRICK, ASHLEIGH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Brief in support of motion to dismiss petition as untimely
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/02 8:39 AM
ANSWER to1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, by TYRONE OLIVER.(HEADRICK, ASHLEIGH)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 06/02 8:32 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by ASHLEIGH DENE HEADRICK on behalf of TYRONE OLIVER Attorney ASHLEIGH DENE HEADRICK added to party TYRONE OLIVER(pty:res)(HEADRICK, ASHLEIGH)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Directing Service Order for Response (Habeas Petition) Mon 04/03 9:07 AM
ORDER Directing Service, and providing for amendment, and ORDER for Respondent to File Responsive Pleading re:1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DARIEN JOSEPH MEHEUX. Ordered by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF on 4/3/2023. (TQL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
2 2 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 03/16 7:53 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (rlw)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Thu 03/16 7:52 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The attorney case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not re-file, corrected by case manager.(rlw)
Related: [-] 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by DARIEN JOSEPH MEHEUX
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
1 1 misc Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 03/15 9:47 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS against Darien Joseph Meheux Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4322807, $5 filed by Darien Joseph Meheux(BULLARD, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exh. 1 - Indictment,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exh. 2 - Ga. Sup. Ct. Opinion,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exh. 3 - Motion for Out of Time Appeal,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exh. 4 - Order Granting Out of Time Appeal,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exh. 5 - Motion for New Trial,
Att: 7 Exhibit Exh. 6 - Cook Opinion,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exh. 7 - Motion to Dismiss and Vacate,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exh. 8 - Order to Vacate,
Att: 10 Exhibit Exh. 9 - Appeal of Order Vacating