TNT Amusements, Inc. v. Torch Electronics, LLC et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John A Ross |
Case #: | 4:23-cv-00330 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:37 AM CDT |
Counter Claimant
Sondra Miltenberger
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Steven Miltenberger
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Torch Electronics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
TNT Amusements, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sondra Miltenberger
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steven Miltenberger
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Torch Electronics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TNT Amusements, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
1. | Second federal lawsuit filed against Missouri slot machine company (stltoday.com) |
Submitted Tue 03/21/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, April 29, 2024 | ||
185 | 185
order
A Docket Text Order
Mon 04/29 11:44 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:184 Joint MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to Depose Expert Witness by Defendants Sondra Miltenberger, Steven Miltenberger, Torch Electronics, LLC. (Craig, James); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Sr. District Judge John A. Ross on 4/29/2024. (CLT) |
|
184 | 184
motion
Extension
Mon 04/29 9:21 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to Depose Expert Witness by Defendants Sondra Miltenberger, Steven Miltenberger, Torch Electronics, LLC. (Craig, James) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
183 | 183
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Fri 04/26 4:18 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re179 MOTION to Strike Untimely and Improper Third Supplemental Expert Report of Stacy Friedman ,181 MOTION to Supplement Expert Report filed by Defendants Sondra Miltenberger, Steven Miltenberger, Torch Electronics, LLC. (Craig, James) |