California Central District Court
Judge:George H Wu
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:23-cv-01868
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
39 39 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 05/06 4:16 PM
Eighth REQUEST for Extension of Time to File SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OR REQUEST OTHER RELIEF filed by Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo. (Drake, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
38 38 order Extension of Time to File Thu 04/24 9:57 AM
ORDER Granting Seventh Request for Extension of Time37 by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. Petitioner shall file a supplemental brief on the issue of timeliness, or request such other relief as his counsel believes appropriate, by May 9, 2025. As previously ordered (ECF No.12 ), Respondent may respond to the petitioner's brief within 14 days of its filing. (vam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
37 37 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 04/22 3:45 PM
Seventh REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief or Request Other Relief filed by Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo. (Drake, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
36 36 order Extension of Time to File Tue 03/25 2:52 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi GRANTING Request for Extension of Time to File35 . Petitioner shall file a supplemental brief on the issue of timeliness, or request such other relief as his counsel believes appropriate, by April 25, 2025. As previously ordered (ECF No.12 ), Respondent may respond to the petitioner's brief within 14 days of its filing. (vam)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
35 35 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 03/21 2:47 PM
Sixth REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief or Request Other Relief filed by Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo. (Drake, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
34 34 order Extension of Time to File Wed 02/26 3:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OR REQUEST OTHER RELIEF33 by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi, the request is GRANTED. Petitioner shall file a supplemental brief on the issue of timeliness, or request such other relief as his counsel believes appropriate, by March 26, 2025. As previously ordered (ECF No. 12), Respondent may respond to the petitioner's brief within 14 days of its filing. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
33 33 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 02/19 10:36 AM
Fifth REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief or Request Other Relief filed by Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo. (Drake, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 31, 2025
32 32 order Extension of Time to File Fri 01/31 2:52 PM
ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's Request for Extension of Time31 by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. Petitioner shall file a supplemental brief on the issue of timeliness, or request such other relief as his counsel believes appropriate, by February 24, 2025. As previously ordered (ECF No.12 ), Respondent may respond to the petitioner's brief within 14 days of its filing. (vam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 01/21 2:45 PM
Fourth REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief or Request Other Relief filed by Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo. (Drake, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
30 30 order For Order Tue 10/22 3:51 PM
ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's Motion to Renew Administrative Stay for Three Months29 by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The case will remain ADMINISTRATIVELY STAYED until January 24, 2025. Petitioner by that date shall file a supplemental brief on the issue of timeliness or request such other relief as his counsel believes appropriate. The respondent may respond to the supplemental brief within 14 days of its filing. (vam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
29 29 10 pgs motion Order Thu 10/17 5:42 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Order for Renewing Administrative Stay for Three More Months (Unopposed) filed by Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo. (Drake, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
28 28 order Stay Case Wed 04/24 2:54 PM
ORDER GRANTING Petitioner's Motion for Six Month Stay27 by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. SEE ATTACHED ORDER FOR DETAILS. (vam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
27 27 motion Stay Case Tue 04/23 10:30 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case Administratively filed by Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo. (Drake, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 04, 2024
26 26 order Extension of Time to File Thu 04/04 4:05 PM
ORDER GRANTING Request for Extension of Time25 by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. Petitioner shall file a supplemental brief on the issue of timeliness, or request such other relief as his counsel believes appropriate, by April 22, 2024. As previously ordered (ECF No.24 ), Respondent may respond to the petitioner's brief within 14 days of its filing. (vam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 03/27 4:50 PM
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief or Request Other Relief filed by Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo. (Drake, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 02, 2024
24 24 order Extension of Time to File a Document Fri 02/02 4:49 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The request is GRANTED23 . Petitioner shall file a supplemental brief on the issue of timeliness, or request such other relief as his counsel believes appropriate, by April 1, 2024. As previously ordered ECF No.12 , Respondent may respond to the petitioner's brief within 14 days of its filing. (vam)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
23 23 misc Miscellaneous Document Mon 01/29 3:13 PM
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief or Request Other Relief filed by Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo(Drake, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
22 22 attyseal Sealed Document Wed 12/20 1:48 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT Notice of Lodging Under Seal re Order,21 filed by Respondent Saint Andre.(Byrne, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LD2_PR,
Att: 2 LD3_COR 1,
Att: 3 LD4_SAC MH,
Att: 4 LD5_COR MH 1,
Att: 5 LD6_COR MH,
Att: 6 LD7_COR,
Att: 7 LD8_HDSP 1,
Att: 8 LD9_HDSP 2,
Att: 9 LD10_HDSP,
Att: 10 LD11_KVSP 1,
Att: 11 LD12_KVSP 2,
Att: 12 LD13_KVSP 4,
Att: 13 LD14_KVSP 5,
Att: 14 LD15_KVSP 6,
Att: 15 LD16_RIS,
Att: 16 LD17_SAC 2,
Att: 17 LD18_SAC 3,
Att: 18 LD19_SAC 4,
Att: 19 LD20_SAC 5,
Att: 20 LD21_SAC MH 2,
Att: 21 LD22_SAC MH 3,
Att: 22 LD23_SAC 1,
Att: 23 LD24_SAC,
Att: 24 LD25_SATF,
Att: 25 LD26_Declaration,
Att: 26 LD27_COR 2 Vol. 1 of 4,
Att: 27 LD27_COR 2 Vol. 2 of 4,
Att: 28 LD27_COR 2 Vol. 3 of 4,
Att: 29 LD27_COR 2 Vol. 4 of 4,
Att: 30 LD28_COR 3,
Att: 31 LD29_COR MH 2,
Att: 32 LD30_KVSP 3,
Att: 33 LD31_KVSP,
Att: 34 LD32_Decl. Petillo Historical,
Att: 35 LD33_Historical 1 Vol. 1 of 4,
Att: 36 LD33_Historical 1 Vol. 2 of 4,
Att: 37 LD33_Historical 1 Vol. 3 of 4,
Att: 38 LD33_Historical 1 Vol. 4 of 4,
Att: 39 LD34_Historical 2 Vol. 1 of 3,
Att: 40 LD34_Historical 2 Vol. 2 of 3,
Att: 41 LD34_Historical 2 Vol. 3 of 3,
Att: 42 LD35_Historical
Tuesday, December 19, 2023
21 21 1 pgs order Order Tue 12/19 2:48 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi, Having considered Respondent's application to lodge probation report and Petitioner's prison medical records under seal, and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the application is GRANTED and the probation report and Petitioner's prison medical records be lodged under seal. (es)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Extension of Time to File Tue 12/19 2:41 PM
ORDER GRANTING PETITIONER'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF OR REQUEST OTHER RELIEF18 by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. Petitioner shall file a supplemental brief on the issue of timeliness, or request such other relief as his counsel believes appropriate, by February 1, 2024. As previously ordered (ECF No. 12), Respondent may respond to the petitioner's brief within 14 days of its filing. by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: (es)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 14, 2023
19 19 attyseal Sealed Document Thu 12/14 3:45 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT Unopposed Application to Lodge Probation Report and Prison Medical Records Under Seal; Declaration of Kenneth C. Byrne re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,16 filed by Respondent Saint Andre.(Byrne, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, December 11, 2023
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 12/11 3:23 PM
REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Brief or Request Other Relief filed by Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo. (Drake, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 08, 2023
17 17 notice Notice of Lodging Fri 12/08 3:02 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File,16 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,, Add and Terminate Attorneys,,,,12(Byrne, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LD1 RT Vol. 1 of 2,
Att: 2 LD1 RT Vol. 2 of 2
Monday, December 04, 2023
16 16 order Extension of Time to File Tue 12/05 3:45 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the application is GRANTED and Respondent may lodge copies of the trial transcripts, pretrial sentence report, and Petitioner's prison medical records on or before December 17, 2023. Granting15 APPLICATION for Extension of Time. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 11/29 12:49 PM
APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File to Lodge the Documents enumerated in the Court's minute order dated November 3, 2023; Declaration of Kenneth C. Byrne filed by Respondent Saint Andre. (Attorney Kenneth C Byrne added to party Saint Andre(pty:res)) (Byrne, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, November 20, 2023
14 14 notice Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Mon 11/20 12:27 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Section IV incomplete; missing name on signature line. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Fri 11/17 4:18 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael T. Drake counsel for Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo. Adding Michael Drake as counsel of record for Petitioner for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo. (Attorney Michael T. Drake added to party Sydney A. Petillo(pty:pet))(Drake, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
12 12 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 11/06 11:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: Accordingly, the Office of the Federal Public Defender is hereby appointed as counsel for Petitioner for the limited purpose of assisting Petitioner to respond to the Court's Order to Show Cause, Dkt. 6. Within fourteen (14) days of this order, the assigned Deputy Federal Public Defender is ORDERED to serve and file a Notice of Appearance. Within thirty (30) days of this order, Respondent is further ordered to obtain and lodge with the Court all available records relevant to the timeliness of Petitioner's Petition and Petitioner's claim of mental disability and/or illness, such as trial transcripts, pretrial sentence report, and prison medical records. Within sixty (60) days of this Order, Petitioner's counsel shall file a Supplemental Brief on the issue of timeliness, or request such other relief as they believe appropriate. Respondent may also respond to Petitioner's Brief within fourteen (14) days of its filing. [See document for further information.] (es)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment
Thursday, November 02, 2023
11 11 order Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P) Thu 11/02 12:38 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (HABEAS) by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: The Request is GRANTED.; granting2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 21, 2023
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/27 1:42 PM
NOTICE filed by Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo. (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 21, 2023
9 9 respm Statement (Motion related) Fri 08/25 2:35 PM
Inmate Statement Report REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support2 filed by Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo. (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
8 8 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 07/27 2:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) ORDER CONDITIONALLY APPOINTING COUNSEL by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: For these reasons, the Court finds that it is in the interests of justice to appoint counsel for the limited purpose of assisting Petitioner to respond to the Court's Order to Show Cause, Dkt. 6. To expedite the matter, the Court requests that prison officials at High Desert State Prison provide the Court with a certified copy of Petitioners trust account statement and a certificate of authorized officer directly. The court clerk is directed to send a copy of this minute order to the Trust Account Office at High Desert State Petition. [SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION.] (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
7 7 misc Response Mon 05/15 8:50 AM
RESPONSE filed by Petitioner Sydney A. Petillo to Order to Show Cause,6 (es)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 19, 2023
6 6 5 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 04/19 2:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: WHY PETITION SHOULD NOT BE SUMMARILY DISMISSED AS UNTIMELY by Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi: The Court will not make a final determination regarding whether the Petition should be dismissed as untimely before giving Petitioner an opportunity to explain why the Petition is timely or why he is entitled to tolling. Thus, the Court ORDERS Petitioner to show cause within twenty-one (21) days of this Order, by May 10, 2023, why the Petition should not be dismissed as untimely. [See document for further information.] (es)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
5 5 order Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV 60P) Mon 03/20 11:26 AM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS (HABEAS) by Judge George H. Wu. On the question of indigency, the Court finds that the Petitioner: has not submitted enough information for the Court to tell if Petitioner is able to pay the filing fee. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that: Ruling on the Request is POSTPONED for 30 days so that Petitioner may provide additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS).; deferring ruling on2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. (aco)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form Wed 03/15 5:20 PM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 10, 2023
3 3 misc Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate - DECLINED by Party Wed 03/15 5:14 PM
ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Petitioner Sydney Andrew Petillo. The Petitioner does not consent. (car)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P) Wed 03/15 5:13 PM
Declaration in Support of Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with filed by Petitioner Sydney Andrew Petillo. (car)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) Wed 03/15 5:11 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi.(Filing fee $ 5. FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Sydney Andrew Petillo. (car)
Related: [-]