California Central District Court
Judge:John A Kronstadt
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:23-cv-01947
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 2:54 AM PDT
Defendant
Antony J. Blinken
Represented By
Jason K Axe
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
Roya Falahati
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Shokrolah Falahati
Represented By
Curtis Lee Morrison
Red Eagle Law, L.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, October 16, 2023
15 15 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 10/16 9:11 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Roya Falahati, Shokrolah Falahati. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 15, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order Extending Answer Due Deadline Fri 08/18 10:34 AM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT13 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 10/21/2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 10, 2023
13 13 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Thu 08/10 9:52 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 10/21/23 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Antony J. Blinken.(Axe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, June 22, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order Extending Answer Due Deadline Fri 06/23 11:00 AM
ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to August 21, 2023. Within ten days of the completion of the current settlement discussions, the parties shall file either a proposed order dismissing the action, or a joint report stating their collective and/or respective positions as to the procedural status of those negotiations, whether further discussions in the future with a neutral would be productive, and if so when. Any joint report shall not disclose any substantive elements of the settlement discussions. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Tue 06/20 2:59 PM
Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 8/21/23 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Antony J. Blinken.(Axe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
10 10 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 05/16 12:20 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Antony J. Blinken answer now due 6/20/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant Antony J. Blinken.(Attorney Jason K Axe added to party Antony J. Blinken(pty:dft))(Axe, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
9 9 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Thu 04/06 9:31 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Roya Falahati, Shokrolah Falahati, upon Defendant Antony J. Blinken served on 3/20/2023, answer due 5/19/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Velot, Title Uknown. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Signature illegible, unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Uknown, unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached.(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, March 16, 2023
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 03/16 11:01 AM
STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (tj)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/16 9:06 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant Antony J. Blinken. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Thu 03/16 9:03 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Thu 03/16 9:03 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (sh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 03/15 7:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Roya Falahati, Shokrolah Falahati, identifying N/A. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Wed 03/15 7:34 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiffs Roya Falahati, Shokrolah Falahati. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 03/15 7:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Roya Falahati, Shokrolah Falahati. (Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 03/15 6:48 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34964621 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiffs Roya Falahati, Shokrolah Falahati. (Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party Roya Falahati(pty:pla), Attorney Curtis Lee Morrison added to party Shokrolah Falahati(pty:pla))(Morrison, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C