Vanessa Hernandez v. DermCare Management, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01949 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Terminated: | Sep 28, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
DermCare Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Skin and Beauty Center, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Vanessa Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, October 23, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Receipt
Mon 10/23 4:12 PM
Receipt of Remand by Los Angeles County Superior Court 10/9/2023. (lc) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Notification of Case Number
Fri 10/13 2:23 PM
NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 23-2656 as to defendant DermCare Management, LLC. (mat) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Thu 09/28 4:37 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, No. 22STCV40910. (lc) |
|
18 | 18
order
Remand Case to State Court
Thu 09/28 4:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND13 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The Case is Remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case Number 22STCV40910. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lc) |
|
Monday, September 25, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Miscellaneous Document
Mon 09/25 6:25 PM
Local Rule 83-9.2 Joint Request for Decision on Plaintiff's Remand Motion filed by Plaintiff Vanessa Hernandez re: Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 16 (Yslas, John) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 05/08 4:30 PM
TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OF PLAINTIFF VANESSA HERNANDEZ NEE GONZALEZ FOR ORDER REMANDING ACTION TO STATE COURT (DKT.13 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court finds that the Motion For Order Remanding Action to State Court currently scheduled for hearing on May 12, 2023, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. The court expects the parties to continue litigating this action diligently, while awaiting the court's ruling on this motion. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) |
|
Friday, April 28, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Fri 04/28 5:35 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court13 filed by Plaintiff Vanessa Hernandez.(Yslas, John) |
|
Att: 1 Evidentiary Objections to the Declarations of Grad and Torrey, | ||
Att: 2 Request for Judicial Notice | ||
Friday, April 21, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
27
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
Fri 04/21 4:49 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court13 filed by Defendant DermCare Management, LLC.(Torrey, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Rebecca L. Torrey in support of opposition, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Marc Grad in support of opposition | ||
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Remand Case to State Court
Fri 04/14 3:30 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Vanessa Hernandez. Motion set for hearing on 5/12/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Yslas, John) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeffrey C. Bils, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Andrew Sandoval, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Fri 04/14 3:00 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Vanessa Hernandez, identifying Vanessa Hernandez, Dermcare Management, LLC and Skin and Beauty Center, Inc. (Yslas, John) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Fri 04/14 2:54 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jeffrey Charles Bils counsel for Plaintiff Vanessa Hernandez. Adding Jeffrey C. Bils as counsel of record for Vanessa Hernandez for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Vanessa Hernandez. (Attorney Jeffrey Charles Bils added to party Vanessa Hernandez(pty:pla))(Bils, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 03/20 4:49 PM
Notice of Filing Answers to Complaint filed by Defendants DermCare Management, LLC, Skin and Beauty Center, Inc..(Torrey, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - DermCare Management LLC's answer to complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Skin and Beauty Center, Inc.'s answer to complaint | ||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/17 11:16 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 2:34 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 2:34 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 2:33 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (lh) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 03/15 8:30 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant DermCare Management, LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 served on March 15, 2023. (Torrey, Rebecca) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 8:23 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Skin and Beauty Center, Inc., identifying DermCare Management, LLC. (Attorney Rebecca L Torrey added to party Skin and Beauty Center, Inc.(pty:dft))(Torrey, Rebecca) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 8:21 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DermCare Management, LLC, identifying DermCare Holdings, LLC. (Torrey, Rebecca) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 8:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant DermCare Management, LLC. (Torrey, Rebecca) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 8:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 22STCV40910 Receipt No: ACACDC-34964768 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant DermCare Management, LLC. (Attorney Rebecca L Torrey added to party DermCare Management, LLC(pty:dft))(Torrey, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Complaint | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 2:38 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants DermCare Management, LLC, Does, Skin and Beauty Center, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Vanessa Hernandez. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/29/2022 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |
||
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Thu 03/16 2:43 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Vanessa Hernandez, upon Defendant DermCare Management, LLC served on 2/15/2023, answer due 3/8/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendants in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/16/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |