Curties L. Clark v. Pruco Securities, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Wesley L Hsu |
Referred: | Michael R Wilner |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01950 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Superior Court for the County of Los Angeles, 22STCV93058 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:14 AM PDT |
Defendant
Pruco Securities, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Prudential Insurance Company of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Prudential Advisors
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis L. Clark
8306 Wilshire Bouleard Suite 557
Beverly Hills, CA 90211 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, February 02, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
stip
Dismiss Case
Fri 02/02 11:27 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii) Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Nam, Yoon-Woo) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
minutes
Show Cause Hearing - optional html form ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Link Non-Motion Documents to Minutes
Sat 12/09 10:24 PM
MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL 25 held before Judge Wesley L. Hsu. On October 4, 2023, the court scheduled an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal ("OSC"). (Dkt. 25 ) Plaintiff and Defendants filed a Response to Order to Show Cause on December 5, 2023. (Dkts.26 &27 ) The court DISCHARGES the OSC. The Court sets a briefing schedule for Defendants Motion to Enforce Settlement. Defendants' motion is to be filed on or before February 2, 2024. Any opposition to Defendants motion is due on February 16, 2024, and any reply is due on February 23, 2024. The Court sets the hearing on the Motion to Enforce Settlement for March 1, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. The Court orders Plaintiff's counsel to file their request to withdrawal, if necessary, prior to the Motion to Enforce Settlement briefing schedule. Court Recorder: CourtSmart. (lom) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 12/06 10:45 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL (DKT. 25 ) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Response
Tue 12/05 9:57 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Curtis L. Clark to Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (McCoy Payton, Chantal) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Response
Tue 12/05 4:30 PM
RESPONSE filed by Defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, Prudential Advisors, The Prudential Insurance Company of Americato Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 25 (Nam, Yoon-Woo) |
|
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 10/04 1:37 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: On 10/4/23, Plaintiff filed Notice of Settlement (Dkt.24 ). The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for December 8, 2023 at 1:00 p.m. If the parties file a dismissal or response to OSC by 12/1/2023, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. All scheduled dates and deadlines are hereby VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Settlement
Wed 10/04 11:22 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Curtis L. Clark. (Griggs, Johnny) |
|
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Wed 10/04 10:39 AM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Chantal McCoy Payton counsel for Plaintiff Curtis L. Clark. Adding Chantal McCoy Payton, Esq. as counsel of record for Plaintiff Curtis L. Clark for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Curtis L. Clark.(Attorney Chantal McCoy Payton added to party Curtis L. Clark(pty:pla))(McCoy Payton, Chantal) |
|
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Friday, August 25, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
order
Substitute Attorney
Fri 08/25 4:18 PM
ORDER by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: granting20 ,21 Request to Substitute Attorney: The Court hereby orders that the request of: Curtis L. Clark, Plaintiff, to substitute Johnny Darnell Griggs, Esq. of Payton Employment Law, PC, who is Retained Counsel, as attorney of record instead of Johnny Darnell Griggs, Esq. of The Griggs Firm. The clerk is hereby ordered to terminate Notices of Electronic Filing for the withdrawing attorney(s) in this case. (bm) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Amendment (Motion related)
Thu 08/17 2:21 PM
Amendment to First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Johnny Darnell Griggs, Esq. in place of attorney Johnny Darnell Griggs, Esq. of The Griggs Firm 20 filed by Plaintiff Curtis L. Clark.(Griggs, Johnny) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Proof of Service | ||
20 | 20
motion
Substitute Attorney (G-01)
Thu 08/17 1:09 PM
First REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Johnny Darnell Griggs, Esq. in place of attorney Johnny Darnell Griggs, Esq. of The Griggs Firm filed by Plaintiff Curtis L. Clark. (Griggs, Johnny) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
order
Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/14 9:44 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL DATES18 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Court hereby GRANTS the Joint Stipulation to Continue Trial Dates and Pretrial Dates and ORDERS a revised Case Management Order attached hereto with the new trial date of March 12, 2024, and corresponding deadlines. Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2024 03:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 3/12/2024 09:00 AM. See order for other deadlines and information. (lom) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
stip
Continue
Fri 08/04 4:32 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date And Pretrial Dates from October 23, 2023 to June 4, 2024 filed by Joint Pruco Securities, LLC, Prudential Advisors, The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Bethany A Pelliconi added to party Prudential Advisors(pty:dft))(Pelliconi, Bethany) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Pelliconi, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A iso Pelliconi Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration B iso Pelliconi Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
13
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/12 9:47 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) |
|
16 | 16
18
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/12 9:45 AM
STANDING ORDER FOR NEWLY ASSIGNED CIVIL CASES by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom) |
|
15 | 15
20
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/12 9:43 AM
CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The pretrial schedule governing this case is set forth in the Court's April 27, 2023, Scheduling Order. If the parties wish to set additional or alternative dates, they must file a stipulation and proposed order setting forth the dates requested and demonstrating good cause. Please refer to the Court's Standing Order for Newly Assigned Civil Cases for requirements for specific motions, discovery, certain types of filings, courtesy copies, emailing signature items to chambers, settlement, and other matters pertaining to all civil cases. See order for further details. (lom) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Mon 05/22 10:07 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-056) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01950-WLH (MRWx). (et) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Thu 04/27 2:03 PM
CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/27 4:09 PM
MINUTES OF NEW CASE STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Status conference held. The Court sets the following dates: Jury Trial set for 10/31/2023 09:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2023 03:00 PM. Court Reporter: Laura Elias (lom) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Tue 03/21 4:34 PM
ORDER SETTING RULE 26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/10/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (kmh) |
|
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 03/21 4:32 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (kmh) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
cs_rasgn
Reassign Case - Self -Recusal --pursuant GO 21-01 (CV-52)
Mon 03/20 2:34 PM
ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 21-01 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:23-cv-01950 SVW(MRWx). (rn) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Fri 03/17 3:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. EFFECTIVE IMMEDIATELY- No mandatory chambers copies required, EXCEPT FOR EXCEPT FOR motions for summary judgment and any other evidence-heavy motions. The Court's Electronic Document Submission System (EDSS) allows people without lawyers who have pending cases in the US District Court for the Central District of California to submit documents electronically to the Clerk's Office The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to Court's Website and Judge's procedures for information as applicable (lc) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 3:24 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 3:23 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 3:23 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Exhibit (non-trial)
Thu 03/16 9:14 AM
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Exhibit D as to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 . (Nam, Yoon-Woo) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 8:30 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America, (Nam, Yoon-Woo) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 8:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Nam, Yoon-Woo) |
|
1 | 1
14
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 8:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California for the County of Los Angeles, case number 22STCV93058 Receipt No: ACACDC-34964777 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attorney Yoon-Woo Nam added to party Pruco Securities, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Yoon-Woo Nam added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Nam, Yoon-Woo) |
|
Att: 1 59 pgs Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit F | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 3:30 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Pruco Securities, LLC, Prudential Advisors, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Curtis L. Clark. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint (Discovery)
Thu 03/16 3:33 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh) |