GS Holistic, LLC v. Headquarters Smoke et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Wesley L Hsu |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01951 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1121 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:22 AM PDT |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Headquarters Smoke
|
|
Plaintiff
GS Holistic, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, November 27, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 11/27 4:05 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Headquarters Smoke UNDER SUBMISSION19 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The court finds the MOTION currently scheduled for hearing on 12/1/2023, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. The court expects the parties to continue litigating this action diligently, while awaiting the court's ruling on this motion. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Tuesday, November 21, 2023 | ||
33 | 33
4
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/21 11:03 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF TAX AND FEE ADMINISTRATION TO REVEAL IDENTITY OF DEFENDANT HEADQUARTERS SMOKE'S OWNER24 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Court GRANTS the Motion and ORDERS the California Department of Tax and Fee Administration to disclose to counsel of record for GS Holistic any document(s) containing the name and address of Headquarters Smoke's owner. The Court permits the CDTFA to redact any other information from the document(s). GS Holistic is to serve this Order on the CDTFA and file a proof of service with this Court. The CDTFA is ordered to produce the document(s) to counsel of record for GS Holistic within 30 days of service of this Order. Before producing the document(s) to counsel, the CDTFA must "reasonably attempt to notify the individual to whom the record pertains" pursuant to California Civil Code section 1798.24(k). Once produced, the document(s) may only be used by counsel for GS Holistic and only in connection with this case. The document(s) may not be disclosed to any non-party and may not be used for any other purpose. Upon conclusion of the case, counsel for GS Holistic must destroy the document(s). (lom) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
minutes
Motion Hearing Leave
Mon 11/20 5:21 PM
MINUTES OF FIRST REQUEST TO REQUEST THE CDTFA TO REVEAL THE IDENTITY OF HEADQUARTERS SMOKE'S OWNER24 (ZOOM) Hearing held before Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The matter was called, and counsel stated their appearances. The Court states its tentative views that it is inclined to grant Plaintiff's Request to Request the CDTFA to Reveal the Identity of Headquarters Smoke's Owner. Counsel addresses the Court. The Court orally orders the Request GRANTED. A separate order will be issued. Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (bm) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 11/16 12:58 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING PLAINTIFF'S First REQUEST to Request The CDTFA To Reveal The Identity of The Headquarters Smoke's Owner (DKT.24 ) by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The Court, on its own motion, advances the Motion from 1:30 P.M. to 11/17/2023 at 9:30 a.m. The hearing will proceed via Zoom webinar. Counsel are directed to refer to the Court's Procedures and Schedules page found on the website for the United States District Court for zoom webinar information. http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov/honorable-wesley-l-hsu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
Tuesday, November 14, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
order
For Order
Tue 11/14 4:46 PM
ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT THE NOVEMBER 17, 2023, HEARING29 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu Granting29 REQUEST: Upon consideration of the Plaintiff's Motion, and being otherwise fully advised on the premises, it is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Telephonically at the November 17, 2023, hearing is GRANTED. (bm) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
2
pgs
motion
Order
Mon 11/13 12:10 PM
REQUEST for Order for Plaintiff's Counsel to Appear Telephonically at the November 17th 2023 Hearing filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, October 16, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
order
For Order
Mon 10/16 5:34 PM
ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY22 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu granting22 REQUEST: Upon consideration of the Plaintiff's Motion, and being otherwise fully advised on the premises, it is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Telephonically is GRANTED. (bm) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 10/13 3:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC, re Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form,,26 , First REQUEST to Request The CDTFA To Reveal The Identity of The Headquarters Smoke's Owner 24 (Leon, Tomas) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
order
Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form
Wed 10/11 12:31 PM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT25 RE: First REQUEST to The CDTFA24 by Judge Wesley L. Hsu: The hearing date has been rescheduled to Friday, November 17, 2023 at 1:30 PM. Other: Counsel is directed to refer to the Federal Rules and Local Rules of Civil Procedure before noticing a motion. Any future motion may be stricken for failing to adhere to the rules of civil procedure. The court, on its own motion, continues the Motion from 10/27/2023 to 11/17/2023 at 1:30 p.m. The precise time of the hearing may change upon the issuance of the final calendar for that date. The hearing will proceed in person at the First Street Courthouse, Courtroom 9B. (bm) |
|
25 | 25
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Wed 10/11 11:24 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: First REQUEST to Request The CDTFA To Reveal The Identity of The Headquarters Smoke's Owner 24 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (bm) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Leave
Tue 10/10 3:34 PM
First REQUEST to Request The CDTFA To Reveal The Identity of The Headquarters Smoke's Owner filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. Request set for hearing on 10/27/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (Leon, Tomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 04, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Wed 10/04 12:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC, re for Order22 (Leon, Tomas) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Motion for Order
Mon 10/02 3:28 PM
REQUEST for Order for for Plaintiff's Counsel to Appear Telephonically at the December 1st Hearing filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas) Modified on 10/2/2023 (lom) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit | ||
21 | 21
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Mon 10/02 3:18 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC, re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Headquarters Smoke d/b/a Headquarters Smoke19 (Leon, Tomas) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form
Thu 09/28 1:39 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Document RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Headquarters Smoke d/b/a Headquarters Smoke19 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 11-8 Memorandum/brief exceeding 10 pages shall contain table of contents. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 09/26 5:47 PM
First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Headquarters Smoke d/b/a Headquarters Smoke filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 12/1/2023 at 01:30 PM before Judge Wesley L. Hsu. (Leon, Tomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 6 Affidavit | ||
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 08/23 10:09 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff was ordered to show cause why the court should not dismiss the case. On 8/22/23, Plaintiff filed the required Request for Default, (Dkt. No.16 ) which sufficiently addresses the Order to Show Cause. Accordingly, the court's Order to Show Cause is VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (hc) |
|
17 | 17
order
Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form
Wed 08/23 8:36 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Headquarters Smoke dba Headquarters Smoke (lom) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Clerk to Enter Default
Tue 08/22 3:14 PM
First REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Headquarters Smoke filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 08/15 12:49 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Wesley L. Hsu. The Court, on its own motion, hereby ORDERS plaintiff, to show cause in writing no later than 08/22/2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiffs, the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Answer to the Complaint; Request for Entry of Default; or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (F.R.Civ.P. 41). See minute order for details. (lom) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Tue 08/01 11:17 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE WESLEY L. HSU (hc) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 06/12 2:16 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC, upon Defendant Headquarters Smoke served on 5/2/2023, answer due 5/23/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jerry T. who identified themselves as the Person Authorized to Accept with identity confirmed by subject stating their name. The individual accepted service with direct delivery. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy (Leon, Tomas) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
cs_rasgn
Chief District Judge Transferring Case
Mon 05/22 10:26 AM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-050) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Mark C. Scarsi to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01951-WLH-JCx. (sn) |
|
Thursday, April 20, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/20 3:18 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant John Doe. (lc) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/20 3:17 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to defendant Headquarters Smoke d/b/a Headquarters Smoke. (lc) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Summons Request
Thu 04/20 2:30 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only8 filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC.(Leon, Tomas) |
|
Att: 1 Remaining Summons | ||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/17 11:46 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (smo) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:50 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:50 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Thu 03/16 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 03/15 9:06 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC, identifying Chris Folkerts, GS Holistic, LLC, Leon Law LLP, Tomas Carlos Leon, HEADQUARTERS SMOKE d/b/a HEADQUARTERS SMOKE, and JOHN DOE. (Leon, Tomas) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Wed 03/15 9:04 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Wed 03/15 9:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Leon, Tomas) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 03/15 9:01 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34964853 - Fee: $402, filed by Attorney for the Plaintiff GS Holistic, LLC. (Attorney Tomas Carlos Leon added to party GS Holistic, LLC(pty:pla))(Leon, Tomas) |