Eduardo Nunez Jimenez v. R and R FCI Victorville
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | John F Walter |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00435 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Mar 13, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 10, 2023 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 10, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
order
Dismissing Case
Wed 05/10 3:33 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OR REMAND by Judge John F. Walter. This case is HEREBY ORDERED DISMISSED without prejudice. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) |
|
Wednesday, March 15, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Wed 03/15 10:25 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) |
|
Tuesday, March 14, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93P)
Wed 03/15 10:24 AM
Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93P). Upon submission of your civil rights complaint, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. Re: Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights)1 (car) |
|
Monday, March 13, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - (Prisoner Civil Rights)
Wed 03/15 10:22 AM
CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendant pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge John F. Walter and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, filed by Plaintiff Eduardo Nunez Jimenez. (car) |