California Central District Court
Judge:Otis D Wright, II
Referred: Charles F Eick
Case #: 5:23-cv-00436
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2023
Terminated:Mar 16, 2023

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 23 minutes ago
Thursday, March 16, 2023
8 8 order Certificate of Appealability - Order of USDC Thu 03/16 1:42 PM
Order Denying Certificate of Appealability by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. IT IS ORDERED that the Certificate of Appealability is denied. Re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254).1 (vmun)
Related: [-]
7 7 judgmentCV Judgment Thu 03/16 1:38 PM
JUDGMENT by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. IT IS ADJUDGED that the Petition is denied and dismissed without prejudice. Related to: Order of Dismissal6 (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (vmun)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Dismissing Case Thu 03/16 1:35 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Otis D. Wright, II re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254).1 For the reasons discussed, the Petition is denied and dismissed without prejudice. (See document for details) (vmun)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
5 5 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-84) (Habeas) - optional html form Wed 03/15 11:11 AM
NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
4 4 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 03/15 11:09 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner Zuri Sana-Kabisa Young, re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254),1 served on 3/7/2023. (car)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate - DECLINED by Party Wed 03/15 11:03 AM
ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Petitioner Zuri Sana-Kabisa Young. The Petitioner does not consent. (car)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV-60P) Wed 03/15 11:02 AM
Declaration in Support of Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Petitioner Zuri Sana-Kabisa Young. (car)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) Wed 03/15 10:58 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In State Custody (28:2254) Case assigned to Judge Otis D. Wright, II and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick.(Filing fee $ 5. FEE DUE), filed by Petitioner Zuri Sana-Kabisa Young. (car)
Related: [-]