Georgia Middle District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00007
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Mar 16, 2023 3:23 AM EDT
Defendant
PALMER HILL (1)
Plaintiff
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
ALEX KALIM
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Oct 08 2024
ORDER Directing the Bureau of Prisons to produce federal prisoner PALMER HILL, Register Number 49981-510, presently incarcerated at the Mendota Federal Correctional Institution (FCI) for a Restitution hearing beginning at 11:00 a.m. on Tuesday, December 10, 2024, before the undersigned on the second floor of he United States Courthouse, 115 E Hancock Avenue, Athens, Georgia. The Court DIRECTS the United States Marshals Service to properly serve this Order as to PALMER HILL. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 10/8/2024. (vs) Modified on 10/8/2024 to edit docket text(vs). (Main Document 60 replaced on 10/8/2024) (vs).

Docket last updated: 03/16/2023 4:07 AM EDT
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
1 1 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to PALMER HILL (1) count(s) 1-2. (ggs)
Related: [-]