Arisha Byars v. Macys, Inc. et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sunshine Suzanne Sykes |
Referred: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00456 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 20, 2023 |
Case in other court: | San Bernardino County Superior Court, CIV SB 2217010 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:40 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Macys, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arisha Byars
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Receipt
Sat 03/09 6:11 PM
RECEIPT G-17 (01/23) RE LETTER OF TRANSMITTAL - REMAND TO SUPERIOR COURT RECEIVED ON 10/27/23 BY CLERK VERONICA GONZALEZ (shb) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form
Tue 10/24 2:15 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Superior Court for the State of California, San Bernardino. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Superior Court for the State of California, San Bernardino. (rolm) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
minutes
Show Cause Hearing - optional html form
Tue 10/24 2:12 PM
MINUTES OF ZOOM HEARING RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION held before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Counsel state their appearances. The Court confers with counsel regarding and hears oral argument. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court REMANDS this action to the San Bernardino County Superior Court. Court Recorder: RS-CS-2 10-20-23. (rolm) |
|
Thursday, October 19, 2023 | ||
30 | 30
notice
Appearance
Thu 10/19 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney David W. Reid on behalf of Plaintiff Arisha Byars |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Response
Fri 10/13 12:59 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Arisha Byarsto Order on Motion to Dismiss,27 (Ferrell, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of S. Ferrell, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Dec of S. Ferrell, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Dec of S. Ferrell, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Dec of S. Ferrell, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 to Dec of S. Ferrell, | ||
Att: 6 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 1 to RJN, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 2 to RJN | ||
Friday, October 06, 2023 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Response
Fri 10/06 3:53 PM
RESPONSE filed by Defendant Macys, Inc.to Order on Motion to Dismiss,27 Order to Show Cause(Brooks, Meegan) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Stuart Stockton | ||
Monday, September 11, 2023 | ||
27 | 27
order
Dismiss
Wed 09/13 11:48 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Defendant is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing why this action should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Defendant's brief is due October 6, 2023, and Plaintiff's opposition is due October 13, 2023 The Court sets a hearing on this matter for October 20, 2023, at 1:00 p.m. via Zoom videoconference. The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendants motion to dismiss23 . (pj) Modified on 9/13/2023 (pj) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2023 | ||
26 | 26
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 08/15 4:31 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sunshine S. Sykes: The Court finds that the Motion to Dismiss [Dkt. 23] is appropriate for resolution without a hearing. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 78; L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the Court vacates the hearing set on August 18, 2023. The motion stands submitted on the papers timely filed. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Fri 08/04 5:28 PM
REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 23 filed by Defendant Macys, Inc..(Sheridan, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, July 28, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 07/28 5:26 PM
OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint 23 filed by Plaintiff Arisha Byars.(Ferrell, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Request for Judicial Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to RJN, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to RJN, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of S. Ferrell, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 1 to Dec of S. Ferrell, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 2 to Dec of S. Ferrell, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 3 to Dec of S. Ferrell, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 4 to Dec of S. Ferrell, | ||
Att: 9 Declaration of A. Byars, | ||
Att: 10 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 26, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Dismiss (cause or other)
Mon 06/26 11:45 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Macys, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/18/2023 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (Sheridan, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2023 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 06/20 2:14 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer21 . The Court, having considered the Parties Stipulation and finding good cause, hereby GRANTS the Stipulation and ORDERS that the deadline for Defendant Macy's, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall be extended to and including June 26, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (iva) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Mon 06/12 12:39 PM
Fourth STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 26, 2023 re Amended Complaint/Petition11 filed by Defendant Macys, Inc..(Brooks, Meegan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 08, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 05/08 4:12 PM
ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes, Granting Third Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply19 . The deadline for Defendant Macys, Inc. to respond to Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint shall be extended to and including June 12, 2023. (twdb) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 05/05 5:04 PM
Third STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition11 filed by Defendant Macys, Inc..(Brooks, Meegan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 12, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
order
Substitute Attorney
Wed 04/12 3:41 PM
ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: Granting14 Request to Substitute Attorney Stephanie A. Sheridan. Attorney Emily Johnson Henn and Cortlin H Lannin terminated. (twdb) |
|
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 04/12 1:33 PM
ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes, Granting Second Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to First Amended Complaint16 . Deadline extended and including 5/12/23. (twdb) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 04/11 2:05 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Amended Complaint/Petition11 filed by Defendant Macys, Inc..(Brooks, Meegan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123)
Tue 04/11 1:39 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Meegan Bay Brooks counsel for Defendant Macys, Inc.. Adding Meegan B. Brooks as counsel of record for Macy's Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Macy's Inc.. (Attorney Meegan Bay Brooks added to party Macys, Inc.(pty:dft))(Brooks, Meegan) |
|
14 | 14
motion
Substitute Attorney (G-01)
Tue 04/11 1:04 PM
REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Stephanie A Sheridan in place of attorney Emily Johnson Henn and Cortlin Lannin filed by Defendant Macys, Inc.. (Attorney Stephanie A Sheridan added to party Macys, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Sheridan, Stephanie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Mon 03/27 10:55 AM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. (iva) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
order
Extending Answer Due Deadline
Thu 03/23 12:40 PM
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS (L.R. 8-3),8 , by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes: It is hereby ORDERED as follows: 1. Given Defendant Macys, Inc.s consent pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(2), Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint (FAC) on or before March, 23, 2023; and 2. Defendant Macys, Inc.s deadline to respond to the operative Complaint shall be extended to April 13, 2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb) |
|
11 | 11
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Wed 03/22 4:41 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Arisha Byars(Ferrell, Scott) |
|
10 | 10
textonly
Generic Text Only Entry
Wed 03/22 12:38 PM
This action has been reassigned to the Honorable Sunshine S. Sykes, United States District Judge. Judge Sykes is located in Courtroom 2, on the 2nd Floor of the George E. Brown, Jr. Federal Building and United States Courthouse at 3470 Twelfth Street, Riverside, California 92501. Additional information regarding Judge Sykes' procedures and schedules is available on the Court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (iva) |
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
order
Transferring Case purs GO 21-01 (Related Case)(CV-34)
Tue 03/21 9:52 AM
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:22-cv-01358 SSS(KKx). Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:23-cv-00456 SSS(KKx). Signed by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes (rn) |
|
Monday, March 20, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
stip
Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less)
Mon 03/20 12:58 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Macys, Inc. answer now due 4/13/2023, re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Macys, Inc..(Henn, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint | ||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Related Case(s)
Fri 03/17 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Arisha Byars. Related Case(s): 5:22-cv-01358 (Ferrell, Scott) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/17 12:59 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
5 | 5
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 12:59 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Reassignment of Eastern Division Removal Case (CV-106) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 12:58 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:23-cv-00456 CAS (KKx). (car) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant MACY'S, INC., identifying Arisha Byars, Pacific Trial Attorneys, Members of the putative class, Macy's Inc., Macys.com LLC, Macy's Retail Holdings, LLC, Does 1 though 25. (Henn, Emily) |
|
2 | 2
4
pgs
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 11:14 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant MACY'S, INC.. (Henn, Emily) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 11:05 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIV SB 2217010 with filing fee previously paid ($402 paid on 03/16/2023, receipt number 34966467), filed by Defendant MACY'S, INC.. (Attorney Emily Johnson Henn added to party MACY'S, INC.(pty:dft))(Henn, Emily) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Steven R. Watts in Support of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 9 pgs Exhibit A - State Court Class Action Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Case Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Notice of Reassignment of Case for All Purposes, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E - Certificate of Assignment, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit F - Notice of Trial Setting Conference, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit G - ADR Program Info Package, | ||
Att: 9 Proof of Service | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 2:32 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-25, inclusive, Macys, Inc., filed by Plaintiff Arisha Byars. Filed in State Court on 8/5/2022 Submitted with Attachment 2 to Notice of Removal1 (car) |