Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:23-bk-70017

Illinois Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mary P Gorman
Case #: 3:23-ap-07003
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:Jul 27, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
270 Park Avenue
New York, NY 10172
Represented By
JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
contact info
Plaintiff
Jeffrey D Richardson
132 S Water St #444
Decatur, IL 62523
Represented By
Jeffrey D Richardson
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM CDT
Thursday, July 27, 2023
24 24 court Close Adversary Case Thu 07/27 6:10 AM
Adversary Case 3:23-ap-7003 Closed (court, apas)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 07/14 11:27 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 07/14/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Mon 07/17 6:00 AM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee - $350.00 by JC. Receipt Number 70077056. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
22 22 utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 07/12 3:55 PM
Disposition of Adversary 23-07003 Close Adversary: 7/26/2023. (court, tsmi)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 07/12 3:54 PM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Check for Closing: 7/26/2023. (court, tsmi)
Related: [-] 20
20 20 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Wed 07/12 1:17 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jeffrey D Richardson on behalf of Jeffrey D Richardson (Richardson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Saturday, June 10, 2023
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 06/10 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/10/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order Compromising Controversy
Thursday, June 08, 2023
18 18 order Compromise Controversy Thu 06/08 1:36 PM
Order Granting Notice of Compromise Related [+] (court, emcc)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, May 05, 2023
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 05/07 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Notice of Compromise
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
16 16 motion Notice of Compromise Wed 05/03 11:41 AM
Notice of Compromise. Notice mailed in the main case. Objections to Compromise Due: 5/24/2023. (court, emcc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 16, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/16 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Proof of Service Deficiency Notice
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/16 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Deficiency re: Entry of Appearance - Attorney
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 04/16 11:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 04/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Extending Time to Answer
Friday, April 14, 2023
12 12 order Extending Time to Answer (Text Order) Fri 04/14 4:06 PM
(Text-only order, no associated pdf) Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Answer Related [+]. Deadline for JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association to Answer extended to 5/15/2023. (court, emcc)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Attorney Filer - Text Only) Fri 04/14 3:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Rebekah A. Carpenter of Akerman LLP on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (Carpenter, Rebekah)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/14 3:40 PM
Certificate of Service Amended Filed by Chen-Chih Ambrosia O'Connor of Akerman, LLP on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association Related [+]. (O'Connor, Chen-Chih Ambrosia)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time to Unopposed Extension - Chase has recently retained counsel., Defendant Chase's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Attorney Filer - Text Only) Fri 04/14 3:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Chen-Chih Ambrosia O'Connor of Akerman, LLP on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association. (O'Connor, Chen-Chih Ambrosia)
Related: [-]
8 8 crtntc Proof of Service Deficiency Notice Fri 04/14 2:17 PM
Proof of Service Deficiency Notice Related [+] Service Deficiency Due 4/21/2023. (court, emcc)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
7 7 crtntc Entry of Appearance Deficiency Notice (MPG) Fri 04/14 2:16 PM
Deficiency re: Entry of Appearance - Attorney for Party Related [+] Entry of Appearance to be filed by 4/21/2023. (court, emcc)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association
6 6 motion Extend/Shorten Time Fri 04/14 1:43 PM
Motion to Extend/Shorten Time to Unopposed Extension - Chase has recently retained counsel., Defendant Chase's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead Filed by Chen-Chih Ambrosia O'Connor of Akerman, LLP on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association (O'Connor, Chen-Chih Ambrosia)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 03/23 1:36 PM
Summons Service Executed on JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association 3/16/2023 (Richardson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 18, 2023
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 03/18 11:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/18/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
Thursday, March 16, 2023
3 3 crtntc Notice re: Filing of Complaint, Service of Summons and Default (Text Only) Thu 03/16 11:57 AM
(Text-only notice, no associated pdf) NOTICE RE: FILING OF COMPLAINT, SERVICE OF SUMMONS, AND DEFAULT. An adversary complaint has been filed. Selection of the proper "nature of suit" when docketing the complaint is important. Please verify that you have selected all actions that apply to your complaint and no others. For more information about selecting the appropriate "nature of suit" when filing a complaint, see the Court's procedures available on the Court's website or click the link below. A summons has been issued for service on the Defendant(s). The Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint within 7 days of issuance. If not served within 7 days, an alias summons must be requested. It is the sole responsibility of the Plaintiff to determine whether an alias summons is needed. Failure to effectuate proper service within 90 days of the filing of the complaint may result in dismissal. Proof of service is required and should be filed using the "Summons Service Executed" docket event. In the event the Defendant fails to appear and respond to the complaint, the Court will enter a default only upon the filing of a motion for default judgment and satisfaction of all other requirements under the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. The Court will no longer request motions for default or default judgment from parties. For more information about the service of summons and complaint and obtaining default judgments, see the Court's procedures for[LINK:Adversary Proceedings: Filing Complaint, Service of Summons, and Motions for Default Judgments] available on the Court's website. (court, emcc)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued Thu 03/16 11:56 AM
Summons Issued on JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association Answer Due 4/15/2023 (court, emcc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/16 11:38 AM
Adversary case 23-07003 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)): Complaint by Jeffrey D Richardson against JP Morgan Chase Bank, National Association Fee Deferred (Richardson, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]