Sonya Valenzuela v. Fathead LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong |
Referred: | Patricia Donahue |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01960 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | May 03, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Los Angeles County Superior Court, 23STCV02969 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:31 AM PDT |
Defendant
Fathead LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Sonya Valenzuela
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 03, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. Dismissal is with Prejudice. (Ferrell, Scott) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. On April 5, 2023, the parties filed a Notice of Settlement14 . The Court, having considered the Notice of Settlement and finding good cause therefor, ORDERS as follows: (1) All discovery and pretrial dates are vacated. (2) The parties shall file a notice of dismissal or, in the alternative, a joint statement advising the Court of the status of the settlement within 45 days of this Order. The failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order may, without further warning, result in the Court dismissing this action. (yl) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (Ferrell, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, March 28, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 03/28 10:47 AM
|
|
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AMENDED filed by Defendant Fathead LLC identifying Volte Fathead Investors, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Mariam, Craig) |
|
11 | 11
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fathead LLC, identifying Volte Fathead Investors, LLC; Tony Saunders; CNA Insurance. (Mariam, Craig) |
|
10 | 10
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Fathead LLC (Mariam, Craig) |
|
9 | 9
![]() STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fathead LLC answer now due 4/6/2023, filed by Defendant Fathead LLC.(Mariam, Craig) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice filed by Defendant Fathead LLC. Notice of Confirmation of Notifying State Court of Removal(Mariam, Craig) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION filed by Defendant Fathead LLC.(Mariam, Craig) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Fathead LLC. (Mariam, Craig) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County, case number 23STCV02969 Receipt No: ACACDC-34967737 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Fathead LLC. (Attorney Craig J. Mariam added to party Fathead LLC(pty:dft))(Mariam, Craig) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 10:08 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Fathead LLC, filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/9/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |