California Central District Court
Judge:Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong
Referred: Patricia Donahue
Case #: 2:23-cv-01960
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:May 03, 2023
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 23STCV02969
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:31 AM PDT
Defendant
Fathead LLC
Represented By
Craig J. Mariam
Gordon Rees Scully And Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Elena A Kuzminova
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Sonya Valenzuela
Represented By
Scott J Ferrell
Pacific Trial Attorneys Apc
contact info
Victoria C. Knowles
Pacific Trial Attorneys Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
16 16 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 05/03 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. Dismissal is with Prejudice. (Ferrell, Scott)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 04/12 3:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong. On April 5, 2023, the parties filed a Notice of Settlement14 . The Court, having considered the Notice of Settlement and finding good cause therefor, ORDERS as follows: (1) All discovery and pretrial dates are vacated. (2) The parties shall file a notice of dismissal or, in the alternative, a joint statement advising the Court of the status of the settlement within 45 days of this Order. The failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order may, without further warning, result in the Court dismissing this action. (yl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
14 14 notice Settlement Wed 04/05 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (Ferrell, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
13 13 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 03/28 10:47 AM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/21 12:36 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AMENDED filed by Defendant Fathead LLC identifying Volte Fathead Investors, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Mariam, Craig)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 03/21 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fathead LLC, identifying Volte Fathead Investors, LLC; Tony Saunders; CNA Insurance. (Mariam, Craig)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/21 10:43 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Fathead LLC (Mariam, Craig)
Related: [-]
9 9 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 03/21 8:58 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Fathead LLC answer now due 4/6/2023, filed by Defendant Fathead LLC.(Mariam, Craig)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/17 5:39 PM
Notice filed by Defendant Fathead LLC. Notice of Confirmation of Notifying State Court of Removal(Mariam, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - To Notice of Confirmation of Notifying State Court of Removal
7 7 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Fri 03/17 10:11 AM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/17 10:05 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/17 10:04 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/17 10:04 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
3 3 misc For Judicial Notice Thu 03/16 12:28 PM
REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF REMOVAL OF ACTION filed by Defendant Fathead LLC.(Mariam, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/16 12:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Fathead LLC. (Mariam, Craig)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/16 12:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County, case number 23STCV02969 Receipt No: ACACDC-34967737 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Fathead LLC. (Attorney Craig J. Mariam added to party Fathead LLC(pty:dft))(Mariam, Craig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Exhibit 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Service Transmittal,
Att: 4 Declaration of Tyler Morgan in Support of Notice of Removal
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 03/17 10:08 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Fathead LLC, filed by Plaintiff Sonya Valenzuela. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 2/9/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]