Sandy Sedlick et al v. City of Redlands et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00457 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Oct 31, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Yessenia Blevins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Redlands
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyler Frisch
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tyler Simonsen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Isaac Spiegel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Sedlick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandy Sedlick
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Thursday, October 31, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
![]() ORDER RE STIPULATION TO DISMISS (FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(l)(A)(ii)36 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, The Court, HEREBY ORDERS that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41 (a)(l)(A)(ii). The parties shall bear their own costs, fees, and expenses. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (es) |
|
Tuesday, October 29, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
![]() STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. 41 (a)(1)(A)(ii). filed by Plaintiff Sandy Sedlick, Joseph Sedlick.(Sehat, Cameron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 23, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
![]() ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Stipulation Modifying the Scheduling Order and Continuing Pre-Trial Deadlines32 . ( All Discovery cut-off 12/30/2024., Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2025., Last date to conduct settlement conference is 1/27/2025., Final Pretrial Conference continued to 4/28/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal., Jury Trial continued to 5/13/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal.) (twdb) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance,,33 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
![]() NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Scott W Davenport on behalf of Defendants Yessenia Blevins, City of Redlands, Tyler Frisch, Jameison Liu, Tyler Simonsen, Isaac Spiegel (Attorney Scott W Davenport added to party Yessenia Blevins(pty:dft), Attorney Scott W Davenport added to party City of Redlands(pty:dft), Attorney Scott W Davenport added to party Tyler Frisch(pty:dft), Attorney Scott W Davenport added to party Jameison Liu(pty:dft), Attorney Scott W Davenport added to party Tyler Simonsen(pty:dft), Attorney Scott W Davenport added to party Isaac Spiegel(pty:dft))(Davenport, Scott) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() First STIPULATION to Continue TRIAL DATES from December 17, 2025 to May 13, 2025 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Sedlick, Sandy Sedlick.(Sehat, Cameron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition27 FAC filed by Defendants Yessenia Blevins, City of Redlands, Tyler Frisch, Jameison Liu, Tyler Simonsen, Isaac Spiegel.(Attorney Danielle Williams added to party Jameison Liu(pty:dft))(Williams, Danielle) |
|
Friday, March 29, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2),28 . The following error(s) was/were found: The case number is incorrect. The document is not properly saved as a PDF Document. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb) |
|
29 | 29
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Richard T. Copeland has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Richard Copeland may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 7/29/2024 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Sedlick, Sandy Sedlick (Sehat, Cameron) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 JURY DEMAND, filed by Plaintiff Joseph Sedlick, Sandy Sedlick (Sehat, Cameron) |
|
Monday, March 18, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal, Granting Joint Stipulation to Substitute Named Party Jameison Liu for Doe "1" and to File a First Amended Complaint25 . (twdb) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() STIPULATION for Order to Substitute Named Party Jameison Liu for Doe "1" and to File a First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Joseph Sedlick, Sandy Sedlick.(Sehat, Cameron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE due to Unavailability of Judicial Officer filed. The previously assigned Magistrate Judge is no longer available. Pursuant to directive of the Chief Magistrate Judge and in accordance with the rules of this Court, the case has been returned to the Clerk for reassignment. This case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for any discovery and/or post-judgment matters that may be referred. Case number will now read as 5:23-cv-00457-JGB (SPx). (et) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 9/02/2024. (mga) |
|
22 | 22
![]() CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Amended Pleadings due by 5/20/2024. Discovery cut-off 8/5/2024. Motions cut-off 10/21/2024. Last date to conduct settlement conference is 9/2/2024. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/2/2024 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Jury Trial set for 12/17/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. See order for details. (mga) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2023 | ||
21 | 21
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Fri 08/18 1:15 AM
The Court hereby vacates the Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2023. The Court will issue a separate trial scheduling order setting forth a trial schedule. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
![]() JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 9, filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Sedlick, Sandy Sedlick..(Sehat, Cameron) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 05, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
![]() PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato re Stipulation for Protective Order18 . (see document for details) (hr) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
![]() STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Yessenia Blevins, City of Redlands, Tyler Frisch, Tyler Simonsen, Isaac Spiegel.(Williams, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (tc) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Yessenia Blevins, City of Redlands, Tyler Frisch, Tyler Simonsen, Isaac Spiegel, (Williams, Danielle) |
|
15 | 15
![]() ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Yessenia Blevins, City of Redlands, Tyler Frisch, Tyler Simonsen, Isaac Spiegel.(Attorney Danielle Williams added to party Yessenia Blevins(pty:dft), Attorney Danielle Williams added to party City of Redlands(pty:dft), Attorney Danielle Williams added to party Tyler Frisch(pty:dft), Attorney Danielle Williams added to party Tyler Simonsen(pty:dft), Attorney Danielle Williams added to party Isaac Spiegel(pty:dft))(Williams, Danielle) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Sedlick, Sandy Sedlick, upon Defendant Yessenia Blevins served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sehat, Cameron) |
|
13 | 13
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Sedlick, Sandy Sedlick, upon Defendant Tyler Simonsen served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sehat, Cameron) |
|
12 | 12
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Sedlick, Sandy Sedlick, upon Defendant Tyler Frisch served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sehat, Cameron) |
|
11 | 11
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Sedlick, Sandy Sedlick, upon Defendant Isaac Spiegel served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defen in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sehat, Cameron) |
|
10 | 10
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Joseph Sedlick, Sandy Sedlick, upon Defendant City of Redlands served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Sehat, Cameron) |
|
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Yessenia Blevins, City of Redlands, Tyler Frisch, Tyler Simonsen, Isaac Spiegel. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (sh) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 filed by Plaintiff Joseph Sedlick, Sandy Sedlick. (Sehat, Cameron) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff All Plaintiffs, (Sehat, Cameron) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Joseph Sedlick, Sandy Sedlick. (Sehat, Cameron) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34968133 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Sandy Sedlick, Joseph Sedlick. (Attorney Cameron Sehat added to party Joseph Sedlick(pty:pla), Attorney Cameron Sehat added to party Sandy Sedlick (pty:pla))(Sehat, Cameron) |