California Central District Court
Judge:Virginia A Phillips
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:23-cv-01968
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:Jan 30, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:57 AM PDT
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Evan R. Franke
Sausa - Us Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
Alejandro N. Mayorkas
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Evan R. Franke
Sausa - Us Attorneys Office
contact info
Defendant
David M. Radel
Represented By
OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Office Of Immigration Litigation
contact info
Evan R. Franke
Sausa - Us Attorneys Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Lin Zheng
Represented By
Justin X. Wang
Baughman And Wang
contact info
Trenton Evan Goulding
Baughman And Wang
contact info
Justin X Wang
Baughman And Wang
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
12 12 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 01/30 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Lin Zheng. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 05/18 9:14 AM
ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION STAYING THE CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION TO MARCH 29, 202410 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (lc) Modified on 5/18/2023 (lc)
Related: [-]
10 10 stip Stay Case Wed 05/17 8:49 AM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of Application filed by Defendants Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, David M. Radel.(Attorney Evan Richard Franke added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Richard Franke added to party Alejandro N. Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Richard Franke added to party David M. Radel(pty:dft))(Franke, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 06, 2023
9 9 service Service of S/C Returned Executed as to USA Thu 04/06 1:00 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lin Zheng, upon Defendant Ur M. Jaddou served on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/30/2023; Alejandro N. Mayorkas served on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/30/2023; David M. Radel served on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached.(Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit delivered confirmation,
Att: 2 Exhibit summons
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 03/22 4:09 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (wm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/17 9:11 AM
60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, David M. Radel. (sh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/17 9:04 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/17 9:04 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/16 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lin Zheng, (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/16 2:07 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lin Zheng. (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Thu 03/16 2:04 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Lin Zheng. (Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/16 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34969320 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Lin Zheng. (Attorney Justin X. Wang added to party Lin Zheng(pty:pla))(Wang, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit