Lin Zheng v. Alejandro N. Mayorkas et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia A Phillips |
Referred: | Alka Sagar |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01968 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petition |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 9:57 AM PDT |
Defendant
Ur M. Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro N. Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David M. Radel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lin Zheng
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Lin Zheng. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Wang, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION STAYING THE CASE PENDING ADJUDICATION OF APPLICATION TO MARCH 29, 202410 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (lc) Modified on 5/18/2023 (lc) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Adjudication of Application filed by Defendants Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, David M. Radel.(Attorney Evan Richard Franke added to party Ur M. Jaddou(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Richard Franke added to party Alejandro N. Mayorkas(pty:dft), Attorney Evan Richard Franke added to party David M. Radel(pty:dft))(Franke, Evan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 06, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lin Zheng, upon Defendant Ur M. Jaddou served on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/30/2023; Alejandro N. Mayorkas served on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/30/2023; David M. Radel served on 3/30/2023, answer due 5/30/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached.(Wang, Justin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Wednesday, March 22, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() STANDING ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (wm) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Ur M. Jaddou, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, David M. Radel. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (sh) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lin Zheng, (Wang, Justin) |
|
3 | 3
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lin Zheng. (Wang, Justin) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Lin Zheng. (Wang, Justin) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34969320 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff Lin Zheng. (Attorney Justin X. Wang added to party Lin Zheng(pty:pla))(Wang, Justin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |