Pierre Villiet v. Amerisave Mortgage Corporation
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Jesus G Bernal |
Referred: | Sheri Pym |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00458 |
Nature of Suit | 485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act |
Cause | 47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 01, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Mar 15, 2024 5:11 PM PDT |
Defendant
Amerisave Mortgage Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pierre Villiet
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, June 02, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Pierre Villiet. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Kaufman, Rachel) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 06/01 10:36 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. In light of the Notice of Tentative Settlement filed May 17, 2023 12 , indicating that the case has settled, this action is placed in inactive status. By July 17, 2023, the parties shall file either (1) a proper stipulation and order for dismissal or judgment or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of July 18, 2023. This Court retains full jurisdiction over this action and this Order shall not prejudice any party. All previously set deadlines and dates are hereby VACATED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JS-6) THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (mga) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Pierre Villiet. (Kaufman, Rachel) |
|
Friday, April 14, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amerisave Mortgage Corporation answer now due 5/17/2023, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Amerisave Mortgage Corporation.(Attorney Rebecca J. Wahlquist added to party Amerisave Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft))(Wahlquist, Rebecca) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Pierre Villiet, upon Defendant Amerisave Mortgage Corporation served on 3/27/2023, answer due 4/17/2023. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned.(Kaufman, Rachel) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Amerisave Mortgage Corporation. (sh) |
|
7 | 7
![]() Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) |
|
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (sh) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pierre Villiet, (Kaufman, Rachel) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Pierre Villiet. (Kaufman, Rachel) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Pierre Villiet. (Kaufman, Rachel) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34968738 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Pierre Villiet. (Attorney Rachel Kaufman added to party Pierre Villiet(pty:pla))(Kaufman, Rachel) |