California Central District Court
Judge:Stephanie S Christensen
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 5:23-cv-00459
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:Mar 04, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, April 12, 2024
25 25 order For Order re Discovery Matter Fri 04/12 9:05 AM
ORDER AWARDING EAJA FEES by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen re24 STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees. IT IS ORDERED that EAJA attorney fees are awarded in the amount of FIVE THOUSAND ONE HUNDRED SIXTY-NINE DOLLARS AND 32/100 ($5,169.32) and zero costs ($00.00), subject to the terms of the stipulation. (tsn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
24 24 stip Award of EAJA Fees Thu 04/11 1:46 PM
STIPULATION FOR AWARD of EAJA Fees in the amount of $5,169.32. Re: Judgment23 filed by Plaintiff Shannon M Downs.(Panutich, Alex)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Fee Assignment
Monday, March 04, 2024
23 23 judgmentCV Judgment Mon 03/04 12:33 PM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (tsn)
Related: [-]
22 22 order For Order re Discovery Matter Mon 03/04 12:31 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. IT IS ORDERED that Judgment shall be entered REVERSING the decision of the Commissioner denying benefits and REMANDING this action for further proceedings consistent with this Memorandum and Order. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (tsn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
21 21 misc Reply Thu 11/02 9:17 PM
REPLY filed by Plaintiff Shannon M Downs to Brief (non-motion non-appeal)20 Plaintiff's Reply Brief (Warren, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 19, 2023
20 20 misc Brief (non-motion non-appeal) Thu 10/19 3:37 PM
BRIEF filed by defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Banks, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 12, 2023
19 19 2 pgs order Order Tue 09/12 2:16 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply18 . IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until October 19, 2023, to file Defendant's response to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and Plaintiff shall have until November 2, 2023 to file any reply. (tsn)
Related: [-]
18 18 stip Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 09/12 12:39 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File response filed by defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Attorney Andrea Lee Banks added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Banks, Andrea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, August 18, 2023
17 17 misc Brief (non-motion non-appeal) Fri 08/18 10:23 PM
BRIEF filed by Plaintiff Shannon M Downs. (Warren, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
16 16 1 pgs order Order Mon 07/31 2:18 PM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Stephanie S Christensen, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File15 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, pursuant to the parties' stipulation, that the parties shall be granted a second extension for 15 days for Plaintiff to e-file her brief on or before August 15, 2023. Defendant will e-file her brief on or before September 14, 2023. Plaintiff will e-file any reply on or before September 28, 2023. (es)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
15 15 stip Extension of Time to File Document Thu 07/27 8:13 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief filed by Plaintiff Shannon M Downs.(Warren, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
14 14 cs_rasgn Chief Magistrate Judge Transferring Case (non-consent) Thu 07/06 1:13 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF MAGISTRATE JUDGE - OCMJ# 23-064 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF THE CALENDAR of Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen, this case is transferred from the calendar of Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian to the calendar of Magistrate Judge Stephanie S Christensen for all further proceedings authorized by statute, local rules and general orders. All documents subsequently filed shall bear this new case designation 5:23-cv-00459-SSC absent further order of the Court. (et)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order Thu 06/22 9:55 AM
ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File12 . Plaintiff to e-file her brief on or before July 31, 2023. Defendant will e-file her brief on or before August 30, 2023. Plaintiff will e-file any reply on or before September 13, 2023. (hr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
12 12 stip Extension of Time to File Document Tue 06/20 11:45 AM
First STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Brief filed by Plaintiff Shannon M Downs.(Warren, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 05/16 10:03 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF SHANNON M DOWNS (mj), PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Gulseth, Geralyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Page,
Att: 2 Court Transcript Index,
Att: 3 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable,
Att: 4 Payment Documents and Decisions,
Att: 5 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices,
Att: 6 Non Disability Related Development,
Att: 7 Disability Related Development,
Att: 8 Medical Records Part 1,
Att: 9 Medical Records Part 2
Monday, April 10, 2023
10 10 notice Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge Mon 04/10 8:30 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV23-459 JC on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
9 9 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (non-AUSA) Fri 04/07 1:03 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Warren, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
8 8 misc Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only) Wed 04/05 10:57 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Geralyn A Gulseth added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Gulseth, Geralyn)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/20 10:48 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER [Social Security] by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (see document for details) (hr)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Fri 03/17 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
6 6 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Fri 03/17 4:11 PM
ORDER ON REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Granting4 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS THEREFOR ORDERED that: the Request is Granted. (es)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) Thu 03/16 1:47 PM
REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Shannon M Downs. (Warren, Jessica)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/16 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shannon M Downs, (Warren, Jessica)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/16 1:25 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shannon M Downs. (Warren, Jessica)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/16 1:19 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Shannon M Downs. (Attorney Jessica Elizabeth Warren added to party Shannon M Downs(pty:pla))(Warren, Jessica)
Related: [-]