Iannuzzi, Jr. v. Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
Nevada District Court | |
Judge: | Gloria M Navarro |
Referred: | Elayna J Youchah |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00409 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Eighth Judicial District Court, A-22-863027-C |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:16 AM PDT |
Defendant
Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John V. Iannuzzi, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, December 29, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER Granting13 Stipulation for Dismissal. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/29/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
![]() STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Busby, Jerry) (dismissal) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER Granting11 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Discovery due by 2/9/2024. Motions due by 3/11/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/10/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 9/12/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - RGDG) |
|
11 | 11
![]() STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. (Marques, Andre) (extend) (discovery) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() ORDER Granting8 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 12/11/2023. Motions due by 1/10/2024. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/9/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 4/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc... (Busby, Jerry) |
|
notice
Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge
Mon 04/10 12:50 PM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (LOE) |
||
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc... (Busby, Jerry) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for4 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc...(Busby, Jerry) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc... (Busby, Jerry) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/17/2023. By Deputy Clerk: L. Ortiz. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/1/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/16/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Fred Meyer, Inc., Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc. added. (Busby, Jerry) |
|
utility
Assign Judges in Civil Case
Fri 03/17 10:54 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (LOE) |
||
order
Standing Order
Fri 03/17 10:54 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) |
||
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-863027-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7238326) by Smith's Food & Drug Centers, Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/26/2023. (Busby, Jerry) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |