Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Susan E Schwab
Case #: 1:23-cv-00466
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:Nov 08, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:04 AM EDT
Defendant
Progressive Advanced Insurance Company
Represented By
Jennifer L. Stauffer
Forry Ullman
contact info
Mediator
Mediator
Represented By
Edwin A.D. Schwartz
Mcnees Wallace & Nurick
contact info
Plaintiff
Erica England
Represented By
Joshua D Baer
Simon & Simon
contact info


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Friday, November 08, 2024
74 74 order Judgment Fri 11/08 2:41 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Erica England against Progressive Advanced Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 11/8/24. (ae)
Related: [-]
67 67 1 pgs order Order Fri 11/08 1:21 PM
ORDER - the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Ms. England in the amount of $0 (as molded by the court). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 11/8/24. (ae)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
73 73 misc Sealed Document (pdf only) Fri 11/08 2:39 PM
DOCUMENT SEALED (unredacted verdict form). (ae)
Related: [-]
72 72 trial Jury Verdict Fri 11/08 2:38 PM
JURY VERDICT Related [+]. (ae)
Related: [-] dacted
69 69 trial Exhibit List Fri 11/08 2:32 PM
Defendant's Exhibit List by Progressive Advanced Insurance Company.(ae)
Related: [-]
68 68 trial Exhibit List Fri 11/08 2:32 PM
Plaintiff's Exhibit List by Erica England.(ae)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
64 64 1 pgs order Order Tue 11/05 3:18 PM
ORDER - Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1871, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is authorized to pay the attached invoice for juror meals, lodging, and/or other expenditures incurred due to the deliberation or sequestration of the jurors in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 11/5/24. (ae)
Related: [-]
62 62 trial Jury List Tue 11/05 1:22 PM
Jury List. (ae)
Related: [-]