Nevada District Court
Judge:James C Mahan
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:23-cv-00411
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:Apr 12, 2023
Case in other court:Ninth Judicial District Court of Nevada, 2023-CV-00033
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:14 AM PDT
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
Represented By
Tabetha Martinez
Strongin Burger LLP
contact info
Susan Gillespie
Burger Meyer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Pamela Caughron
Represented By
Sarah M. Quigley
Bradley, Drendel & Jeanney
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
transfer Divisional Transfer-case transferred out to LV/Reno, close case Wed 04/12 9:58 AM
Intradistrict Transfer to Northern Division. Reno Case No. 3:23-cv-00156. (no image attached) (JQC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
14 14 1 pgs order Order Wed 04/12 9:48 AM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this action is transferred to the unofficial Northern Division of this District for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/11/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
13 13 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 04/07 11:25 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pamela Caughron. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Quigley, Sarah)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/07 11:08 AM
ORDER. Plaintiff must file an Amended Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/14/2023, fully identifying her citizenship. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs order Order Fri 04/07 11:06 AM
ORDER. The Court Strikes the above-referenced document, and instructs the parties to refrain from filing discovery documents on the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
10 10 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 04/06 1:17 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Pamela Caughron. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Quigley, Sarah)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice Other Thu 04/06 1:14 PM
NOTICE Notice of FRCP 26 Conference by Pamela Caughron.. (Quigley, Sarah)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Status Report Thu 04/06 10:50 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Walmart Inc... (Gillespie, Susan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
7 7 misc Statement in Removal Case Thu 03/30 2:34 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Walmart Inc...(Gillespie, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-5 in Support of Statement Re Removal
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
6 6 answer Answer to Petition for Removal Wed 03/22 2:05 PM
ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal,,, filed by Walmart Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/1/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/6/2023.(Gillespie, Susan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate Interested Parties Wed 03/22 2:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walmart Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Gillespie, Susan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
4 4 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/17 9:58 AM
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant must file an Amended Certificate of Interested Parties by 3/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
3 3 minord Minute Order Removal Case Thu 03/16 3:35 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 3/16/2023. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/31/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/15/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 03/16 2:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walmart Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gillespie, Susan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition Removal Thu 03/16 2:45 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Ninth Judicial District Court of Nevada, Case Number 2023-CV-00033, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7238260) by Walmart Inc.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/26/2023. (Gillespie, Susan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 8 pgs Exhibit 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Demand Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Nevada Business Search,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 Nevada Secretary of State Business Search,
Att: 6 Declaration of Susan E. Gillespie,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Thu 03/16 3:35 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
Related: [-]