Nevada District Court
Judge:Cristina D Silva
Referred: Daniel J Albregts
Case #: 2:23-cv-00413
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:Apr 10, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 4:44 AM PDT
Defendant
Rancho Mesquite Casino, Inc.
275 Mesa Boulevard
Mesquite, NV 89027
Plaintiff
Andrew Figura
Represented By
Patrick D. Donathen
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Valerie S. Gray
The Bourassa Law Group
contact info
Gary F. Lynch
Lynch Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Mark J Bourassa
The Bourassa Law Group, LLC
contact info
Jennifer A. Fornetti
The Bourassa Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, April 10, 2023
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Order Consolidate Cases Wed 04/12 9:09 AM
ORDER Granting12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. It is ORDERED that 2:23-cv-00413-CDS-VCF is consolidated under 2:23-cv-276-CDS-DJA. The deadlines set forth in Case No. 2:23-cv-00276-CDS-DJA, ECF No. 23, are incorporated herein. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
12 12 motion Motion Consolidate Cases Fri 04/07 10:47 AM
Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Andrew Figura. Responses due by 4/21/2023.(Bourassa, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, April 06, 2023
11 11 5 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/06 11:31 AM
ORDER granting8 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gary F. Lynch and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark J. Bourassa. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/3/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
10 10 5 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/06 10:22 AM
ORDER Granting9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Patrick D. Donathen and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Mark J. Bourassa. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 4/3/2023. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
9 9 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Fri 03/31 2:40 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Patrick D. Donathen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark J. Bourassa (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7254445) by Plaintiff Andrew Figura.(Bourassa, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
8 8 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Fri 03/31 2:38 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gary F. Lynch and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mark J. Bourassa (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number BNVDC-7254436) by Plaintiff Andrew Figura.(Bourassa, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, March 24, 2023
7 7 notice Notice Related Cases Fri 03/24 3:16 PM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by Plaintiff Andrew Figura. . (Bourassa, Mark)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 03/24 10:40 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew Figura re4 Summons Issued. Rancho Mesquite Casino, Inc. served on 3/23/2023. (Bourassa, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 03/17 8:50 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rancho Mesquite Casino, Inc. re1 Complaint. (HAM)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 03/17 8:48 AM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (HAM)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Fri 03/17 8:48 AM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva. Judge Silva's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Fri 03/17 8:52 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Gary F. Lynch, Patrick Donathen to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the PACER website www.pacer.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/31/2023. (no image attached) (HAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 03/16 3:46 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Andrew Figura. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Bourassa, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/16 3:37 PM
COMPLAINT against Rancho Mesquite Casino, Inc. (Filing fee $402 receipt number BNVDC-7238357) by Andrew Figura. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/26/2023. Proof of service due by 6/14/2023. (Bourassa, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons