Nevada District Court
Judge:Carla Baldwin
Referred: Carla Baldwin
Case #: 3:23-cv-00108
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:Apr 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:03 AM PDT
Counter Claimant
Alexxa Goodenough
Represented By
Kendra J. Jepsen
Simons Hall Johnston PC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Paula Belben
Represented By
Michael C. Lehners
Law Office Of Michael Lehners
contact info
Counter Defendant
James Gray
Represented By
Michael C. Lehners
Law Office Of Michael Lehners
contact info
Defendant
Mario Garcia
Defendant
Alexxa Goodenough
Represented By
Kendra J. Jepsen
Simons Hall Johnston PC
contact info
Defendant
National Lease Purchase, LLC
Plaintiff
Paula Belben
Represented By
Michael C. Lehners
Law Office Of Michael Lehners
contact info
Plaintiff
James Gray
Represented By
Michael C. Lehners
Law Office Of Michael Lehners
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
66 66 notice Notice Other Wed 04/23 10:11 AM
NOTICE OF ENTRY by Paula Belben, Paula Belben re64 Order on Stipulation,. (Lehners, Michael)
Related: [-]
65 65 notice Notice Other Wed 04/23 10:10 AM
NOTICE of recording release of lis pendens by Paula Belben, Paula Belben re8 Notice of Lis Pendens. (Lehners, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
64 64 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 04/21 12:36 PM
ORDER granting62 Stipulation with prejudice. Each side to bear their ownattorney fees and costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/18/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
63 63 misc Proposed Order Submission Fri 04/18 1:32 PM
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on62 Stipulation by Plaintiff Paula Belben, Counter Defendant Paula Belben. (Lehners, Michael)
Related: [-]
62 62 motion Stipulation Fri 04/18 1:31 PM
STIPULATION TO DISMISS by Plaintiff Paula Belben, Counter Defendant Paula Belben. (Lehners, Michael) (dismiss)
Related: [-]