Nevada District Court
Judge:Anne R Traum
Referred: Carla Baldwin
Case #: 3:23-cv-00109
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:Mar 07, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 8:11 AM PDT
Defendant
Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By
Michael E Sullivan
Robison, Sharp, Sullivan & Brust
contact info
Hannah E. Winston
Robison, Sharp, Sullivan & Brust
contact info
Plaintiff
Lura Raifaisen
Represented By
Terry A Friedman
contact info
Julie McGrath Throop
Terry Friedman And Julie Throop, PLLC
contact info
Julie Throop
Terry Friedman And Julie Throop, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, March 07, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Order Dismissing Case Fri 03/08 8:44 AM
ORDER APPROVING ECF No.24 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice. All parties to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by District Judge Anne R. Traum on 3/7/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Stipulation Thu 03/07 9:45 AM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Sullivan, Michael) (dismissal)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
23 23 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Fri 10/06 8:54 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER GRANTING ECF No.22 Stipulation : Discovery due by 3/11/2024 . Motions due by 4/9/2024 . Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/9/2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 10/6/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
22 22 motion Stipulation Thu 10/05 4:27 PM
First STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) DISCOVERY DEADLINES by Plaintiff Lura Raifaisen. (Throop, Julie) (continue) (trial)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
21 21 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Fri 05/05 7:00 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DRM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 04, 2023
20 20 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 05/04 4:51 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER re ECF No.17 Stipulated Proposed Order : Discovery due by 12/11/2023 . Dispositive Motions due by 1/10/2024 . Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/9/2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/4/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Case Management Report Thu 05/04 1:36 PM
Joint CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT by Plaintiff Lura Raifaisen. (Throop, Julie)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Thu 05/04 1:30 PM
Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Lura Raifaisen.. (Throop, Julie)
Related: [-]
order Order Thu 05/04 3:06 PM
ORDER - The Court has reviewed the joint case management report, (ECF No.18 ), and it does not appear that an initial case management conference is necessary. If the parties disagree, they may file a stipulation requesting a case management conference. In the event a discovery dispute arises, the parties shall follow the informal discovery dispute procedure outlined in the Court's standing order. (ECF No.12 .) IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/4/2023. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
16 16 9 pgs order Order on Stipulated Protective Order Mon 04/17 2:04 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting ECF No.14 Stipulation re confidential infomation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/17/2023.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Jury Demand Mon 04/17 10:35 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Sullivan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
14 14 motion Stipulated/Consent Judgment Fri 04/14 2:54 PM
STIPULATED/CONSENT JUDGMENT Protective Order by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Sullivan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
13 13 5 pgs order Order Fri 04/07 2:26 PM
ORDER TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT The parties shall file a joint case management report by no later than May 22, 2023 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMC)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Standing Order Fri 04/07 2:15 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER MAGISTRATE JUDGE CARLA BALDWIN (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AMC)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Status Report Fri 04/07 9:06 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Lura Raifaisen.. (Throop, Julie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
10 10 answer Answer to Petition for Removal Thu 03/30 11:26 AM
ANSWER re1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/9/2023. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/14/2023.(Sullivan, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 03/23 3:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lura Raifaisen. Costco Wholesale Corporation served on 3/9/2023. (Throop, Julie)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 03/23 11:19 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lura Raifaisen. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Throop, Julie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
7 7 misc Certificate Interested Parties Fri 03/17 3:15 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Costco Wholesale Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sullivan, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 minord Minute Order Removal Case Fri 03/17 10:21 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable District Judge Anne R. Traum on 3/17/2023. By Deputy Clerk: C. Smith. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/1/2023. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/16/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 03/17 10:20 AM
Case randomly assigned to District Judge Anne R. Traum and Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. (CJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
5 5 notice Notice Other Thu 03/16 4:30 PM
NOTICE Disclosure Statement Under FRCP 7.1 by Costco Wholesale Corporation.. (Sullivan, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Statement in Removal Case Thu 03/16 4:17 PM
STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation.. (Sullivan, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 03/16 4:14 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Costco Wholesale Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Sullivan, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Civil Cover Sheet Thu 03/16 4:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET to1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Sullivan, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Petition Removal Thu 03/16 4:01 PM
PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Second Judicial District Court of Nevada, Case Number CV23-00304, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7238427) by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 3/26/2023. (Sullivan, Michael)
Related: [-]