California Central District Court
Judge:Hernan D Vera
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:23-cv-01979
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:May 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 1:57 AM PDT
Defendant
Yunye Apparel Retail Ltd.
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Dolls Kill, Inc.
Represented By
Trevor William Barrett
Doniger Burroughs
contact info
Frank Trechsel
Doniger Burroughs
contact info
Scott A. Burroughs
Doniger Burroughs
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, May 06, 2024
24 24 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Mon 05/06 12:08 PM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (bm)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
23 23 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 05/03 11:01 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Dolls Kill, Inc.. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Burroughs, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
22 22 order Clerks Entry of Default (CV-37) - optional html form Fri 02/09 11:17 AM
DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to YUNYE APPAREL RETAIL LTD., d/b/a Cutie Peachy. (lom)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
21 21 motion Clerk to Enter Default Thu 02/08 9:39 AM
REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Yunye Apparel Retail Ltd. filed by Plaintiff Dolls Kill, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 02/07 6:02 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 2/15/2024. (wm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 05, 2023
19 19 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 10/05 12:15 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dolls Kill, Inc., upon Defendant Yunye Apparel Retail Ltd. served on 10/5/2023, answer due 10/26/2023. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Yunye Apparel Retail Ltd. d/b/a Cutie Peachy in compliance with statute not specified by method of service not specified(Burroughs, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Email to Defendant
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
18 18 order Amend/Correct Wed 08/16 10:14 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ALTERNATIVE SERVICE16 by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Due to Plaintiff's reasonable efforts to locate and serve Defendant, and the prejudice that may come from the delay to effectuate service through the Hague Service Convention, the Court finds that the particularities and necessities of this case justify service by email. Accordingly, Plaintiff's Application is GRANTED. Additionally, the Court orders Plaintiff to do a good faith search of all email addresses for both the Defendant company and its principals and executives, and then file a Proof of Service that lists all the email addresses, confirms that email service has been made to all addresses, and identifies which addresses were undeliverable, by no later than August 25, 2023. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
17 17 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Mon 08/14 5:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Dolls Kill, Inc., re EX PARTE APPLICATION to Authorize Alternative Means of Service 16 served on August 14, 2023.(Burroughs, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
16 16 motion Amend/Correct Mon 08/14 4:50 PM
EX PARTE APPLICATION to Authorize Alternative Means of Service filed by Plaintiff Dolls Kill, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Frank R. Trechsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Proposed Order
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 08/14 7:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Hernan D. Vera. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause, in writing, no later than August 21, 2023, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following on or before the above date as an appropriate response to this Order to Show Cause: Proof of service of summons and complaint. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 26, 2023
14 14 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 07/26 1:44 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
13 13 misc Statement Fri 07/07 2:20 PM
STATEMENT Case Management Statement filed by Plaintiff Dolls Kill, Inc. re: Order12 . (Burroughs, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
12 12 3 pgs order Order Fri 06/23 12:14 PM
REASSIGNMENT ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera: Please refer to Order for complete details. (cbr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
11 11 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Tue 06/20 3:23 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#OCJ 23-078) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Hernan D. Vera, this case is transferred from Judge John F. Walter to the calendar of Judge Hernan D. Vera for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01979-HDV-JPRx. (sn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/20 12:14 PM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
9 9 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/17 11:21 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Yunye Apparel Retail Ltd. (lh)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/17 11:17 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/17 11:17 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/17 11:16 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
5 5 misc Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121) Thu 03/16 4:15 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Dolls Kill, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/16 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dolls Kill, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Thu 03/16 4:13 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Dolls Kill, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/16 4:11 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dolls Kill, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/16 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34971107 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Dolls Kill, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A. Burroughs added to party Dolls Kill, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A