Lily Daneshgar et al v. State Farm General Insurance Company et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Wilner |
Referred: | Margo A Rocconi |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-01980 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal - Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Ventura County Superior Court, 56-02023-00575561-CU- |
Last checked: Monday Sep 18, 2023 1:35 AM PDT |
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
State Farm General Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lily Daneshgar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shahram Daneshgar
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, March 07, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
stip
Dismiss Case
Thu 03/07 10:42 AM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to With Prejudice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)) filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company.(Batezel, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Tue 02/20 1:58 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE - TEXT ONLY - by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner: All pending dates are vacated, parties are directed to file notice of dismissal by March 30, 2024. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (edr) |
|
Friday, February 16, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Settlement
Fri 02/16 10:43 AM
NOTICE of Settlement filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company. (Batezel, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2023 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Wed 11/08 10:58 AM
STATUS REPORT re ADR filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company. (Batezel, Matthew) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2023 | ||
24 | 24
adr
Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form
Mon 11/06 9:34 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Jean M Lawler has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2023 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12)
Fri 11/03 3:42 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No. 2 by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
22 | 22
adr
Stipulation Regarding Selection of Panel Mediator (Consent) - (ADR-2)
Fri 11/03 11:52 AM
STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Jean Lawler may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 12/12/2023 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company(Batezel, Matthew) |
|
21 | 21
adr
Request for ADR Procedure No. 2 - (ADR-1)
Fri 11/03 11:48 AM
REQUEST for ADR Procedure No. 2 filed. Parties request to appear before a neutral selected from the court's Mediation Panel for mediation. Filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company(Batezel, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form
Wed 11/01 11:50 AM
MINUTES OF HALF-TIME STATUS CONFERENCE held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Status conference held as stated on the record. Parties to submit a status report re ADR in 2 weeks. Court Recorder: CS 11/01/23. (hr) |
|
Wednesday, April 19, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 04/20 10:29 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Jury Trial set for 5/14/2024 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Pretrial Conference set for 5/1/2024 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
18 | 18
minutes
Status Conference - optional html form
Wed 04/19 11:11 AM
MINUTES OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (VIDEO) held before Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner: Case called. Counsel make their appearance. Case management conference held as stated on the record. Court Reporter: CS 04/19/23. (et) |
|
Monday, April 03, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Report
Mon 04/03 1:56 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) REPORT filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company.(Batezel, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates | ||
Monday, March 27, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
3
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 03/28 11:50 AM
ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. To advance the litigation efficiently, the Court will hold a case management conference on April 19 at 10 a.m. (see document for further details) (hr) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11D) before US Magistrate Judge Voluntary Program
Mon 03/27 3:25 PM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before United States Magistrate Judge by all parties pursuant to GO 18-11 is approved by District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. This case is hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner for all further proceedings. Case number will now read 2:23-cv-01980 MRW. (rn) |
|
14 | 14
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Mon 03/27 8:01 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: In light of the parties' consent to proceed before the Hon. Michael R. Wilner (Dkt. No.13 ), the Court VACATES the mandatory scheduling conference (MSC) set for April 14, 2023 and accompanying filing deadlines issued by the Court's MSC order at Dkt. No.11 . THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jgr) |
|
Thursday, March 23, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Lodging
Thu 03/23 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF LODGING filed OF STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form9(Batezel, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE | ||
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 03/17 3:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant State Farm General Insurance Company, re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form8 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form7 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only10 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form9 served on (1) Notice Of Assignment To United States Judges; (2) Notice To Parties Of Court-Directed Adr Program; (3) Notice To Counsel Re Consent To Proceed Before A United States Magistrate Judge; and (4)Standing Order For Civil Cases Assigned To Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. (Batezel, Matthew) |
|
11 | 11
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Fri 03/17 1:10 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: The Court sets an in-person Mandatory Scheduling Conference set for hearing on April 14, 2023 at 8:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. The parties shall file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by April 4, 2023. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (jgr) |
|
10 | 10
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/17 1:09 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (jgr) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/17 11:46 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) |
|
8 | 8
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 11:46 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 11:45 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (lh) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 03/16 4:53 PM
ANSWER to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(Batezel, Matthew) |
|
5 | 5
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Thu 03/16 4:50 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)3 , Declaration2 served on March 16, 2023. (Batezel, Matthew) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, identifying Plaintiffs LILY DANESHGAR and SHAHRAM DANESHGAR. (Batezel, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
3
pgs
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 4:45 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Batezel, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Declaration
Thu 03/16 4:44 PM
DECLARATION of Matthew F. Batezel re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by Defendant STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.(Batezel, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 4:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Ventura County Superior Court, case number 56-2023 0057556-CU-IC-VTA Receipt No: ACACDC-34971124 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attorney Matthew F Batezel added to party STATE FARM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY(pty:dft))(Batezel, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 14 pgs Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint | ||
cmp
Complaint - (Discovery)
Fri 03/17 11:55 AM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, State Farm General Insurance Company, filed by Plaintiffs Lily Daneshgar, Shahram Daneshgar. (FILED IN VENTURA COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 12/10/2023 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh) |