California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:23-cv-01975
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:Jul 03, 2023
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 23STCV00096
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:36 AM PDT
Defendant
CBRE, Inc.
Represented By
Gregory Andrew Ellis
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Aviva M. Grumet-Morris
Winston And Strawn LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas
Plaintiff
California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute
Represented By
Jonathan Aaron Stieglitz
Law Offices Of Jonathan Stieglitz
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, July 17, 2023
34 34 misc Receipt Mon 07/17 4:08 PM
Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 03, 2023
33 33 misc Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (G-17) - optional html form Mon 07/03 2:57 PM
TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case number: 23STCV00096. (jp)
Related: [-]
32 32 order Remand Case to State Court Mon 07/03 2:54 PM
ORDER REMANDING CASE TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA31 by Judge R. Gary Klausner that this action is REMANDED to the Superior Court of the State of California for future proceedings. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
Related: [-]
31 31 stip Remand Case to State Court Mon 07/03 1:36 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant CBRE, Inc..(Ellis, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
30 30 misc Status Report Mon 07/03 12:26 PM
STATUS REPORT Re: Remand of Case filed by Defendant CBRE, Inc.. (Ellis, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 19, 2023
29 29 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 06/19 9:42 AM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute amending Amended Complaint/Petition18 , filed by plaintiff California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute(Stieglitz, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
28 28 order Dismiss Tue 06/13 11:12 AM
MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Motion to Dismiss [DE20 ] by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court GRANTS with leave to amend Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order to file any amended complaint. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2023
27 27 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 06/01 2:50 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim20 , calendared for hearing on 6/5/2023, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 22, 2023
26 26 respm Reply (Motion related) Mon 05/22 4:27 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss18 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim 20 filed by Defendant CBRE, Inc.. (Grumet-Morris, Aviva)
Related: [-]
25 25 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12) Mon 05/22 10:42 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge Audero for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than November 24, 2023. (jre)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Mon 05/22 10:40 AM
ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2024 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Jury Trial set for 1/30/2024 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
23 23 minutes Scheduling Conference - optional html form Mon 05/22 10:38 AM
MINUTES OF Scheduling Conference held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 6/20/2023. Discovery cut-off 10/25/2023. Motions due by 11/8/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2024 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Jury Trial set for 1/30/2024 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Court Reporter: Marea Woolrich. (jre)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
22 22 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Mon 05/15 2:15 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan and Scheduling Conference ; estimated length of trial 2 days, filed by Defendant CBRE, Inc... (Grumet-Morris, Aviva)
Related: [-]
21 21 27 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/15 1:15 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss18 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim 20 filed by Plaintiff California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute.(Stieglitz, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Monday, May 08, 2023
20 20 motion Dismiss (cause or other) Mon 05/08 8:11 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss18 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant CBRE, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/5/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Ellis, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Emily Ghiz,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, April 24, 2023
19 19 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 04/24 11:24 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS)by Judge R. Gary Klausner: Plaintiff having filed a First Amended Complaint18 ON 4/22/2023, Defendant CBRE, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim16 is denied as moot. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 22, 2023
18 18 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Sat 04/22 10:07 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant CBRE, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by plaintiff California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute(Stieglitz, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 14, 2023
17 17 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Fri 04/14 3:50 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/15/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Dismiss Case Fri 04/14 3:36 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant CBRE, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 5/15/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Ellis, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Emily Ghiz,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Thursday, March 23, 2023
15 15 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/23 10:35 AM
ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: granting12 14 Non-Resident Attorney Aviva M. Grumet-Morris APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of CBRE, Inc, designating Gregory A Ellis as local counsel. (lom)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 03/22 6:09 PM
Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aviva M. Grumet-Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CBRE, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/22/2023, Receipt No. ACACDC-34999539) filed by Defendant CBRE, Inc.. (Ellis, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
13 13 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Wed 03/22 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aviva M. Grumet-Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CBRE, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34999539)12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case information is incomplete. DJ and MJ initials missing on application and proposed order. Please note DJ and MJ Notice of Assignment, dated 3/20/23, Dkt. 7. (lt)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 03/22 10:01 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Aviva M. Grumet-Morris to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CBRE, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34999539) filed by Defendant CBRE, Inc.. (Ellis, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 20, 2023
11 11 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 03/20 10:01 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
10 10 attorney Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form Mon 03/20 9:24 AM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Aviva Grumet-Morris. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/20 9:14 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
8 8 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/20 9:13 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/20 9:13 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (car)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
6 6 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 03/17 4:43 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CBRE, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 served on 3/17/2023. (Ellis, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
5 5 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Thu 03/16 4:03 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by Defendant CBRE, Inc..(Ellis, Gregory)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123) Thu 03/16 3:55 PM
Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gregory Andrew Ellis counsel for Defendant CBRE, Inc.. Adding Gregory A. Ellis as counsel of record for CBRE, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant CBRE, Inc.. (Ellis, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/16 3:40 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CBRE, Inc., (Ellis, Gregory)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/16 3:35 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CBRE, Inc.. (Ellis, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/16 3:24 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 23STCV00096 Receipt No: ACACDC-34970374 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant CBRE, Inc.. (Attorney Gregory Andrew Ellis added to party CBRE, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ellis, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 43 pgs Exhibit A - State Court Complaint
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 03/20 9:21 AM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants CBRE, Inc., Does 1-10. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff California Spine And Neurosurgery Institute. Filed in State Court on 1/4/2023 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]