Dennis Cooper v. Donna L. Kaeser et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Kenly Kiya Kato |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00465 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 13, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 6:26 AM PDT |
Defendant
Donna L. Kaeser
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Cooper
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 41 minutes ago |
Tuesday, June 13, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 06/13 4:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Dennis Cooper. (Kim, Jason) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 03/17 2:12 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Donna L. Kaeser. (car) |
|
9 | 9
adr
Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20)
Fri 03/17 1:10 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (jre) |
|
8 | 8
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Fri 03/17 1:10 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Fri 03/17 1:04 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 1:03 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 1:03 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (car) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Thu 03/16 4:28 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Dennis Cooper. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 4:27 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 4:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dennis Cooper. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 4:27 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34971520 - Fee: $402. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party Dennis Cooper(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |