Alexander Cobain Correa v. Kilolo Kijakazi
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Referred: | Douglas F Mccormick |
Case #: | 5:23-cv-00466 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Mar 16, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, January 24, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
judgmentCV
Judgment
Wed 01/24 12:27 PM
JUDGMENT by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, Related to: Memorandum and Opinion20 In accordance with the Memorandum Opinion and Order filed herewith, IT IS HEREBY ADJUDGED that the decision of the Commissioner of Social Security is affirmed and this matter is dismissed with prejudice. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (es) |
|
20 | 20
13
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion on Social Security Cases
Wed 01/24 12:25 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: Re15 The ALJ's denial of benefits is affirmed and this case is dismissed with prejudice. [See document for further information.] (es) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Reply
Tue 11/28 4:30 PM
REPLY filed by Plaintiff Alexander Cobain Correa to Response in Opposition to Motion18 (Pena, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 11/15 9:23 PM
OPPOSITION filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Gulseth, Geralyn) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 10/18 8:40 AM
ORDER EXTENDING THE DATE FOR THE FILING OF DEFENDANT'S BRIEF by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, Based upon the parties' Stipulation, IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's time for filing her responsive brief will be extended by 30 days to November 15, 202316 . (es) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
stip
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 10/12 3:04 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Response Brief filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Gulseth, Geralyn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 15, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Brief (non-motion non-appeal)
Fri 09/15 2:26 PM
BRIEF filed by plaintiff Alexander Cobain Correa. (Pena, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 07/12 9:38 AM
ORDER FOR STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME13 by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, it is ORDERED that that Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, from July 31, 2023 to September 29, 2023, for Plaintiff to serve on defendant with PLAINTIFF'S BRIEF. All other dates in the Court's Scheduling Order shall be extended accordingly. (es) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
stip
Extension of Time to File Document
Tue 07/11 2:32 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Merit Brief Alexander Cobain Correa.(Pena, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, June 30, 2023 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Fri 06/30 9:00 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 AS LIMITED TO THE ELECTRONIC FILING AND SERVICE OF THE CERTIFIED AND SUPPLEMENTAL ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD OF ALEXANDER COBAIN CORREA, PURSUANT TO SUPPLEMENTAL FEDERAL RULES FOR SOCIAL SECURITY REVIEW ACTIONS UNDER 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), RULE 4(b) filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Gulseth, Geralyn) |
|
Att: 1 001 Certification Page, | ||
Att: 2 002 Court Transcript Index, | ||
Att: 3 003 Documents Related to Administrative Process Including Transcript of Oral Hearing, if applicable, | ||
Att: 4 004 Payment Documents and Decisions, | ||
Att: 5 005 Jurisdictional Documents and Notices, | ||
Att: 6 006 Non Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 7 007 Disability Related Development, | ||
Att: 8 008 Medical Records, | ||
Att: 9 000 Complete Certified Administrative Record (Supplemental Administrative Record) | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/18 1:28 PM
ORDER TO EXTEND THE DATE FOR DEFENDANT'S FILING OF THE CERTIFIED ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, re Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days)9 IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall be granted an extension and shall have until June 30, 2023 to file and serve the Certified Administrative Record in this case. (es) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
order
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 05/18 12:30 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick Granting2 APPLICATION to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)2 . (nbo) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
stip
Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days)
Tue 05/16 3:38 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 30, 2023 filed by defendant Kilolo Kijakazi.(Gulseth, Geralyn) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, April 24, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice from Clerk re Final Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/24 9:29 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for all further proceedings. Please use the case number EDCV23-466 DFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn) |
|
Sunday, April 23, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final
Sun 04/23 3:18 PM
STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Pena, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, April 05, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Consent to Proceed before U S Magistrate Judge (AUSA filers only)
Wed 04/05 10:43 AM
CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi. (Attorney Geralyn A Gulseth added to party Kilolo Kijakazi(pty:dft))(Gulseth, Geralyn) |
|
Friday, March 17, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form
Fri 03/17 6:11 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (car) |
|
Thursday, March 16, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Thu 03/16 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties (Pena, Jonathan) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Thu 03/16 4:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alexander Cobain Correa. (Pena, Jonathan) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60)
Thu 03/16 4:58 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support Alexander Cobain Correa. (Pena, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Thu 03/16 4:56 PM
COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request. (Attorney Jonathan Omar Pena added to party Alexander Cobain Correa (pty:pla))(Pena, Jonathan) |