California Central District Court
Judge:Wesley L Hsu
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:23-cv-01984
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Mar 16, 2023
Terminated:Aug 01, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Sep 16, 2023 7:02 AM PDT
Defendant
North American Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff
TMX Holdco, Inc.
Represented By
Bridget Byrnes Hirsch
Anderson Kill PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
10 10 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 08/01 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff TMX Holdco, Inc.. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Hirsch, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
9 9 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Mon 05/22 1:46 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#23-043) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Wesley L. Hsu, this case is transferred from Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett to the calendar of Judge Wesley L. Hsu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:23-cv-01984 WLH(ASx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/20 10:46 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant North American Specialty Insurance Company. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Fri 03/17 2:20 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Fri 03/17 2:20 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Fri 03/17 2:19 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 03/16 5:46 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff TMX Holdco, Inc., identifying The Terminix Company, LLC, CDRSVM Holding, LLC, CDRSVM Investment Holding, LLC, Terminix Holdings, LLC, Rentokil Initial US Holdings, Inc. and Rentokil Initial plc. (Hirsch, Bridget)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Thu 03/16 5:43 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 filed by plaintiff TMX Holdco, Inc.. (Hirsch, Bridget)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 03/16 5:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff TMX Holdco, Inc.. (Hirsch, Bridget)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 03/16 5:36 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34972083 - Fee: $402, filed by plaintiff TMX Holdco, Inc.. (Attorney Bridget Byrnes Hirsch added to party TMX Holdco, Inc.(pty:pla))(Hirsch, Bridget)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D