Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Roy B Dalton, Jr
Referred: Embry J Kidd
Case #: 6:20-cv-00976
Nature of Suit376 Other Statutes - Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause31:3730 Qui Tam False Claims Act
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2020
Last checked: Friday Mar 17, 2023 11:08 PM EDT
Defendant
APDC Cleaning Services, Inc.
Defendant
Anthony Carll
Defendant
Fidel Hernandez
Defendant
Kingwood International Resort, LLC
Defendant
Kingwood Orlando Reunion Resort, LLC
Defendant
Richard Nasser
Defendant
Farbod Zohouri
Movant
United States of America
Represented By
Jeremy Ronald Bloor
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info
Jamie Ann Yavelberg
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Jared S. Wiesner
Department Of Justice, Civil Division, Commercial Litigation
contact info
Plaintiff
Maria Falzarano
Represented By
Juan Ramon Martinez
Morgan & Morgan, PA
contact info
James Dennis Young
Morgan & Morgan Mass Tort Dept.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 11, 2023
42 42 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 07/11 2:49 PM
ORDER dismissing case without prejudice re 38 Notice of Dismissal and 40 Notice of Dismissal. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 7/11/2023. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
41 41 notice Notice (Other) Fri 06/30 5:55 PM
NOTICE by United States of America re40 Notice of voluntary dismissal Consent to Dismissal (Bloor, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Fri 06/30 11:05 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Maria Falzarano (Young, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
39 39 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Thu 06/29 2:50 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Maria Falzarano (Young, James)
Related: [-]
38 38 notice Notice of voluntary dismissal Thu 06/29 1:51 PM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Maria Falzarano, United States of America (Bloor, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 20, 2023
37 37 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 06/20 12:32 PM
ORDER denying 36 Motion to Dismiss. If the parties wish to file for a stipulated form of dismissal as to Kingwood Orlando, they may do so no later than 7/17/2023; otherwise, the previous dismissal with prejudice 31 will remain in effect. In the meantime, the Relator's claims against the remaining Defendants will proceed until the Relator notifies the Court of some resolution. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/16/2023. (RPB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
36 36 motion Dismiss Tue 05/16 12:34 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Stipulation of Dismissal by United States of America.(Bloor, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, April 06, 2023
utility *Remark Thu 04/06 4:26 PM
Remark: Docs.32 and34 have been reviewed. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 4/5/2023. (EP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 04, 2023
34 34 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/04 3:08 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Maria Falzarano. (Young, James)
Related: [-]
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/04 1:24 PM
NOTICE of a Related Action by United States of America Related Cases: No re29 Order (Bloor, Jeremy) Modified on 4/4/2023 to edit docket text (KNC)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 04/04 1:12 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re29 Order by United States of America. (Bloor, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
31 31 2 pgs order Order dismissing case Mon 04/03 8:02 AM
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice as to Defendant Kingwood Orlando Reunion Resort, LLC re 30 Notice of settlement. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate Kingwood Orlando Reunion Resort, LLC as a party to this action. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/31/2023. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
30 30 notice Notice of settlement Mon 03/27 11:51 AM
NOTICE of settlement between Plaintiffs and Defendant Kingwood Orlando Reunion Resort, LLC by United States of America (Bloor, Jeremy) Modified on 3/27/2023 to edit docket text (KNC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
29 29 14 pgs order Order Wed 03/22 10:07 AM
INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/21/2023. (ALL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
28 28 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/20 9:53 AM
ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/20/2023. (JOR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
27 27 2 pgs order Order to Unseal Case Thu 03/16 11:41 AM
Order re 26 Notice of Election to Intervene in Part for Purposes of Settlement and to Decline to Intervene in Part. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 3/15/2023. (KNC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/16 11:32 AM
NOTICE of Election to Intervene in Part for Purposes of Settlement and to Decline to Intervene in Part by United States of America (KNC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 10, 2020
3 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 6/9/2020. (KNC)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 05, 2020
1 1 26 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee $400.00, receipt number ORL0912650 filed by Maria Falzarano.(KNC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet